Global Patent Index - EP 0850115 A4

EP 0850115 A4 2001-05-16 - HIGH SPEED ROLL CASTING PROCESS AND PRODUCT

Title (en)

HIGH SPEED ROLL CASTING PROCESS AND PRODUCT

Title (de)

HOCHGESCHWINDIGKEITSWALZENGIESSVERFAHREN UND SO HEGESTELLTES PRODUKT

Title (fr)

PROCESSUS DE LAMINAGE A HAUTE VITESSE ET PRODUIT OBTENU

Publication

EP 0850115 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96919420 A

Priority

  • BR 9502834 A
  • US 9610319 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9700147A1] The present invention pertains to a method for casting metal between two casting surfaces (8, 10), such as a roll caster, by feeding molten metal (16) into the caster. A fine, uniform layer of carbonaceous material (32) is applied to the exterior of the casting surface (28) upstream of a casting zone (2). Thereafter, the molten metal is solidified as it passes through the casting zone (Z), and the gauge of the solidified metal is reduced at least 10 %. The cast sheet (12) of this invention exhibits a uniform surface appearance.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 11/06; B22D 11/07

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/00 (2006.01); B22D 11/059 (2006.01); B22D 11/06 (2006.01); B22D 11/07 (2006.01); B22D 11/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/0668 (2013.01); B22D 11/0622 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9700147 A1 19970103; AR 002508 A1 19980325; AU 6176896 A 19970115; BR 9502834 A 19970923; EP 0850115 A1 19980701; EP 0850115 A4 20010516; JP 3085985 B2 20000911; JP H11507595 A 19990706; KR 100360176 B1 20030226

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030607

2002-03-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020116

2001-05-16 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010402

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-07-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALCOA ALUMINIO S.A.

1998-07-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALUMINUM COMPANY OF AMERICA

1998-07-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980112

1998-07-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE