Global patent index - EP 0850187 B1

EP 0850187 B1 2000-01-26 - YARN-FEEDING DEVICE

Title (en)

YARN-FEEDING DEVICE

Title (de)

FADENLIEFERGERÄT

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'AMENEE DE FIL

Publication

EP 0850187 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96931017 A

Priority

  • DE 19533312 A
  • EP 9603881 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9709263A1] A yarn-feeding device (F) comprising a stationary housing (1) and a rotatably driven reeling element (9) with an outer ring-like lip (11) that overlaps an inner housing flange in an axially open slot (S). At at least one point on the perimeter (13) of the housing flange (12), within the overlap (Ü), there is a collector (C) which either projects into or withdraws from the slot (S) thus removing any dirt adhering to the inner surface of the lip (11).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 51/22; D03D 47/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 51/22 (2006.01); D03D 47/36 (2006.01); D04B 15/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 47/361 (2013.01); D03D 47/366 (2013.01); D04B 15/48 (2013.01); B65H 2407/51 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9709263 A1 19970313; CN 1084283 C 20020508; CN 1196027 A 19981014; DE 19533312 A1 19970507; EP 0850187 A1 19980701; EP 0850187 B1 20000126; US 5979815 A 19991109

INPADOC legal status

2014-08-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130904

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120924

- Year of fee payment: 17

2005-06-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050401

2005-04-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050401

2003-09-23 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030923

- Year of fee payment: 08

2003-05-06 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030401

2003-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *IRO A.B.

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-09-05 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020905

2001-10-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20011026

- Year of fee payment: 06

2001-09-25 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20010925

- Year of fee payment: 06

2001-09-24 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20010924

- Year of fee payment: 06

2001-01-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-04-18 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-03-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59604315

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20000302

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE IT NL SE

1999-03-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990205

1998-07-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980303

1998-07-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE IT NL SE