Global patent index - EP 0850289 B1

EP 0850289 B1 2000-01-05 - PROCESS AND APPARATUS FOR PRODUCING FUEL GAS

Title (en)

PROCESS AND APPARATUS FOR PRODUCING FUEL GAS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BRENNGASHERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE PRODUIRE DU GAZ COMBUSTIBLE

Publication

EP 0850289 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96942977 A

Priority

  • DE 9601122 W
  • DE 9500816 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9701618A1] The invention concerns a process and apparatus for gasifying carbon-containing products, in particular waste and residues conditioned or processed in a suitable way. Gasification takes place in a mixed flow composed of a counter flow, direct flow and transverse flow. A portion of the gasifying agent is introduced through an inclined grate in the form of a step grate and thrust grating and ash is removed at the bottom end of the grate. Fuel gas is drawn off above the upper level of the grate on the side opposite the lateral feed of the gasifying agent. The gasification apparatus is enclosed in a double-layer insulating/cooling system in which air is used as the insulator and coolant. The gasification process is regulated by the temperature profile of the gasification apparatus, the position of the principal gasification zone is adjusted by ash discharge, the gasification temperature is regulated by the flow of gasifying agent and the output is regulated by the width of the gasification zone. The fuel gas produced is used preferably for generating electricity in a work machine. Exhaust gases are purified preferably with the aid of an active coke filter.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10J 3/26; C10J 3/24; C10J 3/80

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10J 3/02 (2006.01); C10J 3/24 (2006.01); C10J 3/26 (2006.01); C10J 3/80 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10J 3/80 (2013.01); C10J 3/24 (2013.01); C10J 3/26 (2013.01); C10J 3/32 (2013.01); C10J 3/36 (2013.01); C10J 3/723 (2013.01); C10J 3/74 (2013.01); C10J 3/86 (2013.01); C10K 1/024 (2013.01); C10J 2300/1606 (2013.01); C10J 2300/1671 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DK ES FR GB GR IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9701618 A1 19970116; AT 188503 T 20000115; AU 6187496 A 19970130; AU 708656 B2 19990812; CA 2225612 A1 19970116; CA 2225612 C 20020423; CN 1076388 C 20011219; CN 1189184 A 19980729; CZ 286257 B6 20000216; CZ 9704032 A3 19980715; EA 000184 B1 19981224; EP 0850289 A1 19980701; EP 0850289 B1 20000105; ES 2143251 T3 20000501; HU 219421 B 20010428; HU 9900770 A2 19990728; HU 9900770 A3 19991129; JP H11509242 A 19990817; PL 181536 B1 20010831; PL 324349 A1 19980525; US 5961673 A 19991005; WO 9701617 A1 19970116

INPADOC legal status

2012-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110630

2012-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110630

2012-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110630

2012-03-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20120229

2012-03-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 188503

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20110626

2012-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110626

2012-01-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2010-10-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100624

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100621

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100706

- Year of fee payment: 15

2006-09-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20050627

2006-03-06 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2006-03-01 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20050626

2006-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20060101

2006-02-21 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2006-01-03 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060103

2006-01-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060101

2005-06-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050627

2005-06-27 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050627

2005-06-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050626

2005-06-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050626

2004-07-26 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040726

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-07-13 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040713

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-06-28 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040628

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-06-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040628

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-06-25 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040625

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-06-25 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040625

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-01-02 [NLXE] NL: OTHER COMMUNICATIONS CONCERNING EP-PATENTS (PART 3 HEADING XE)

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLXE

- Free Format Text: PAT. BUL. 06/2000 PAGE 805: CORR.: VER VERWERTUNG UND ENTSORGUNG VON RESTSTOFFEN GMBH

2000-12-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-09-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: VER VERWERTUNG UND ENTSORGUNG VON RESTSTOFFEN GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT2

2000-07-12 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: VER VERWERTUNG UND ENTSORGUNG VON RESTSTOFFEN GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2000-06-13 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2000-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2143251

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-04-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-04-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-03-21 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-01-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DK ES FR GB GR IT LI NL SE

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: LT PAYMENT 19980120;LV PAYMENT 19980120;SI PAYMENT 19980120

2000-01-05 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Ref Legal Event Code: LTIE

2000-01-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 188503

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-01-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-01-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: TOPF, NORBERT

1999-01-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: REICHERT, GUENTER

1999-01-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: HAHN, DIETER

1999-01-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: LIEBISCH, GUENTER

1998-12-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19981117

1998-07-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980120

1998-07-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DK ES FR GB GR IT LI NL SE

1998-07-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: LT PAYMENT 980120;LV PAYMENT 980120;SI PAYMENT 980120