Global Patent Index - EP 0850292 B1

EP 0850292 B1 2001-04-11 - COLOUR TRANSFER-INHIBITING WASHING AGENT

Title (en)

COLOUR TRANSFER-INHIBITING WASHING AGENT

Title (de)

FARBÜBERTRAGUNGSINHIBIERENDES WASCHMITTEL

Title (fr)

PRODUIT DETERGENT INHIBANT LE TRANSFERT DE COULEURS

Publication

EP 0850292 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96924815 A

Priority

  • DE 19524451 A
  • EP 9602847 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19524451A1] The invention concerns colour transfer-inhibiting washing agents whose object is to optimize the washing process by minimizing colour transfer, maximizing colour shade maintenance and maximizing cleaning performance. This object is substantially achieved by lowering the content of non-ionic surfactant to amounts of at most 8 wt %. The agents can be used in processes for preventing changes in colour shades and for inhibiting colour transfer to white or differently-coloured laundry when washing coloured laundry, alone or combined with white laundry, in aqueous, surfactant-containing liquor.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/00; C11D 3/37; C11D 3/39; C11D 3/395

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/00 (2006.01); C11D 3/37 (2006.01); C11D 3/39 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/0021 (2013.01); C11D 3/3776 (2013.01); C11D 3/3942 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

EP 0717103 A2 19960619 - CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19524451 A1 19970109; AT 200513 T 20010415; EP 0850292 A1 19980701; EP 0850292 B1 20010411; EP 0850292 B2 20101229; ES 2156285 T3 20010616; ES 2156285 T5 20110425; WO 9703166 A1 19970130

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160630

2016-10-06 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20161006

2016-08-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Ref Legal Event Code: MK07

- Ref Document Number: 200513

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20160629

2016-06-29 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MK

- Effective date: 20160628

2016-06-29 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 59606783

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150622

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150618

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150618

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150619

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150619

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150619

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150626

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-06-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-04-30 [PGRI FR] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGRI

- Effective date: 20130123

2013-02-22 [REG FR D3] DECISION TO REVOKE THE DECISION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: D3

- Effective date: 20130123

2013-01-04 [REG FR RN] APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RN

- Effective date: 20121112

2011-04-25 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Ref Legal Event Code: DC2A

- Ref Document Number: 2156285

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

- Effective date: 20110425

2011-04-13 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2010-12-29 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20101229

2010-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR IT NL

2010-04-28 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: UNILEVER N.V.

- Effective date: 20020110

2008-08-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: HENKEL AG & CO. KGAA

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT2

- Effective date: 20080611

2008-06-11 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: HENKEL AG & CO. KGAA

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2007-04-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20070228

2003-03-26 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: UNILEVER N.V.

- Effective date: 20020110

2002-05-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: UNILEVER N.V.

2002-03-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: UNILEVER N.V.

- Effective date: 20020110

2001-07-03 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2156285

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-05-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59606783

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-05-17

2001-05-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR IT NL

2001-04-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 200513

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-04-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1998-12-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19981023

1998-07-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19971219

1998-07-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR IT NL