Global Patent Index - EP 0850316 A4

EP 0850316 A4 2000-08-23 - CRYPTOPHYCINS FROM ABERRANT BIOSYNTHESIS

Title (en)

CRYPTOPHYCINS FROM ABERRANT BIOSYNTHESIS

Title (de)

CRYPTOPHYCINE, ERHALTEN AUS ABBERANTER BIOSYNTHESE

Title (fr)

CRYPTOPHYCINES OBTENUES A PARTIR D'UNE BIOSYNTHESE ABERRANTE

Publication

EP 0850316 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96932217 A

Priority

  • US 9614670 W
  • US 293595 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9708334A1] Methods for producing cryptophycin compounds by bacterial fermentation are disclosed, together with novel compositions produced thereby.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12P 21/04; C12P 21/02; C07D 273/00; C07D 413/06; C07D 413/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/395 (2006.01); A61P 31/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/10 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); C07D 273/00 (2006.01); C07D 273/08 (2006.01); C07K 5/06 (2006.01); C12N 1/20 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); C12P 21/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 273/00 (2013.01); C12P 21/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] GB 2220657 A 19900117 - MERCK & CO INC [US]
  • [A] CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 114, no. 2, 14 January 1991, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 12039, XP002140923 & R.E. SCHWARTZ ET AL., J. IND. MICROBIOL., vol. 5, no. 2-3, 1990, pages 113 - 123R.E. SCHWARTZ ET AL.J. IND. MICROBIOL.199052-3113123
  • [A] CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 123, no. 13, 25 September 1995, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 164737, XP002140924 & G. TRIMURTULU ET AL., TENNEN YUKI KAGOBUTSU TORONKAI KOEN YOSHISHU, vol. 36th, 1994, pages 744 - 751G. TRIMURTULU ET AL.TENNEN YUKI KAGOBUTSU TORONKAI KOEN YOSHISHU199436th744751
  • [A] CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 121, no. 9, 29 August 1994, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 99272, XP002140925 & C.D. SMITH ET AL., CANCER RES., vol. 54, no. 14, 1994, pages 3779 - 3784C.D. SMITH ET AL.CANCER RES.1994541437793784
  • See also references of WO 9708334A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9708334 A1 19970306; AU 6904896 A 19970319; AU 709828 B2 19990909; AU 7109096 A 19970319; BR 9610214 A 19990615; CA 2230540 A1 19970306; CA 2246117 A1 19970306; EP 0850057 A1 19980701; EP 0850057 A4 20010411; EP 0850316 A1 19980701; EP 0850316 A4 20000823; JP 2000501067 A 20000202; JP 2000507805 A 20000627; WO 9707798 A1 19970306

INPADOC legal status


2002-03-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010828

2001-05-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010417

2000-08-23 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000712

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 12P 21/04 A, 7C 12P 21/02 B, 7C 07D 273/00 B, 7C 07D 413/06 B, 7C 07D 413/14 B, 7C 07D 413/06 J, 7C 07D 303:00 J, 7C 07D 273:00 J

1998-07-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980227

1998-07-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE