Global Patent Index - EP 0850341 B1

EP 0850341 B1 2000-03-15 - ROTO-TRANSLATING TROLLEY FOR PARKING CARS IN GARAGES

Title (en)

ROTO-TRANSLATING TROLLEY FOR PARKING CARS IN GARAGES

Title (de)

DREH- UND SCHIEBEWAGEN ZUM ABSTELLEN VON KRAFTFAHRZEUGEN IN GARAGEN

Title (fr)

CHARIOT TRANSLATEUR A ROTATION POUR LE PARCAGE DE VOITURES DANS LES GARAGES

Publication

EP 0850341 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96931961 A

Priority

  • IT 9600172 W
  • IT AN950044 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9710400A1] This invention concerns a roto-translating trolley for garaging cars. The trolley according to the invention consists of a centre platform (17) to which two bridge runners (18) are fixed. Said platform (17) rotates freely about a vertical pin (15a) projecting from an element (2) which slides along a track (1) fixed to the garage floor.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04H 6/06; E04H 6/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04H 6/06 (2006.01); E04H 6/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 6/40 (2013.01); E04H 6/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9710400 A1 19970320; AT 190690 T 20000415; AU 7094096 A 19970401; DE 69607184 D1 20000420; DE 69607184 T2 20010322; EP 0850341 A1 19980701; EP 0850341 B1 20000315; ES 2146414 T3 20000801; IT 1282949 B1 19980402; IT AN950044 A1 19951211; IT AN950044 D0 19950912; JP 3347739 B2 20021120; JP H11512500 A 19991026

INPADOC legal status


2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150904

- Year of fee payment: 20

2005-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040911

2005-07-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-04-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040910

2005-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050401

2004-09-11 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040911

2004-09-10 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040910

2004-03-10 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040310

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-03-08 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040308

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-03-07 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040307

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-03-05 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040305

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-06-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020401

2002-06-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020401

2002-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-04-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020401

2002-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: FIORANI ALBERTO

- Effective date: 20010930

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010930

2001-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010930

2001-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010930

2001-07-11 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2001-02-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-06 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20001006

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-09-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000930

2000-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20000930

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-09-11 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000911

2000-09-11 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20000911

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-09-10 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000910

2000-08-31 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: DAS PATENT IST AUF GRUND DES WEITERBEHANDLUNGSANTRAGS VOM 14.08.2000 REAKTIVIERT WORDEN.

2000-08-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2000-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2146414 T3

2000-07-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-15 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000615

2000-06-15 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000615

2000-06-13 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TECN. ING. CLAUDIO BALDI

2000-05-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2000-04-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69607184 20000420

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-03-15 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-03-15 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-03-15 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-03-15 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000315

2000-03-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 190690 T 20000415

1999-09-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990811

1998-07-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980306

1998-07-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE