Global patent index - EP 0850360 B1

EP 0850360 B1 2001-04-18 - HOUSING FOR A SIDE CHANNEL COMPRESSOR

Title (en)

HOUSING FOR A SIDE CHANNEL COMPRESSOR

Title (de)

GEHÄUSE FÜR EINEN SEITENKANALVERDICHTER

Title (fr)

BOITIER POUR COMPRESSEUR DE CANAL LATERAL

Publication

EP 0850360 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96934404 A

Priority

  • DE 9601625 W
  • DE 19534293 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9710438A1] The invention relates to a housing for a side channel compressor consisting of two halves. The strength of such a housing can be substantially increased by forming at least two radially spaced rings (4 and 5) projecting axially on the front wall (3) of each half-housing (1 and 2) and spoke-like ribbed walls (7) between said rings (4 and 5).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 23/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 23/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 23/008 (2013.01); F04D 29/023 (2013.01); F04D 29/403 (2013.01); F05D 2300/43 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9710438 A1 19970320; AU 7278396 A 19970401; CN 1196777 A 19981021; EP 0850360 A1 19980701; EP 0850360 B1 20010418; JP 2880295 B2 19990405; JP H10511164 A 19981027; US 5964573 A 19991012

INPADOC legal status

2005-09-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050902

2004-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040401

2002-09-24 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020924

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-04-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-10-17 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20010418

2001-09-14 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2001-07-10 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-05-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59606809

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-05-23

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-04-18 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010418

2001-04-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010418

2000-10-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000830

1998-07-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980304

1998-07-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT