Global patent index - EP 0850364 B1

EP 0850364 B1 2000-01-26 - HYDROSTATIC DRIVE CONTROL DEVICE

Title (en)

HYDROSTATIC DRIVE CONTROL DEVICE

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM ANSTEUERN EINES HYDROSTATISCHEN ANTRIEBES

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE D'UN MECANISME D'ENTRAINEMENT HYDROSTATIQUE

Publication

EP 0850364 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96931065 A

Priority

  • AT 150995 A
  • EP 9603964 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9710444A1] The invention concerns a device for controlling a hydrostatic drive (1), said device comprising a resonator (2) which is connected on one side to the hydrostatic drive (1) and on the other side to a pressure medium supply line (4) and a return line (5). The device also comprises a pilot valve (3) which can be actuated periodically and connects the resonator (2) alternately to the pressure medium supply line (4) and the return line (5). In order to ensure that control conditions are advantageous, the resonator (2) comprises at least one pressure chamber (6) with a movable chamber-delimiting system (7) which can oscillate in order to vary the volume of the chamber. The movable chamber-delimiting system (7) forms part of a single-mass oscillator consisting of a mass and a spring (10) or itself forms such a single-mass oscillator. The pressure chamber (6), which can be connected alternately to the pressure medium supply line (4), the return line (5) and the hydrostatic drive (1), can be acted upon via the pilot valve (3) at a switching frequency lying in the super-resonance range of the single-mass oscillator.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 21/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 21/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 21/125 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9710444 A1 19970320; AT 189295 T 20000215; AT A150995 A 19971215; CZ 286073 B6 20000112; CZ 9800743 A3 19991013; DE 59604316 D1 20000302; EP 0850364 A1 19980701; EP 0850364 B1 20000126; US 6082108 A 20000704

INPADOC legal status

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110910

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 189295

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20110910

2011-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-07-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59604316

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110401

2010-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100920

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20091120

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070910

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070910

2008-05-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20070910

2006-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060930

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-09-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060922

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-07-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2004-05-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040528

2002-08-16 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020816

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-01-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-06-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000531

2000-06-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-03-17 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-03-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59604316

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-02

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT

2000-01-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 189295

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-02-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-07-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990609

1998-07-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980130

1998-07-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT