Global Patent Index - EP 0850583 A3

EP 0850583 A3 2001-01-24 - A tray for jewellery and imitation jewellery articles and the like

Title (en)

A tray for jewellery and imitation jewellery articles and the like

Title (de)

Trägerplatte für Schmuck, Imitationsschmuck und dergleichen

Title (fr)

Plateau pour bijoux, articles de bijouterie fantaisie et analogue

Publication

EP 0850583 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 97500190 A

Priority

ES 9603255 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0850583A2] The tray comprises a modular frame formed by four side members apt to be orthogonally joined end to end with each other. The tray is characterized in that each side member comprises on the inner surface of its end portions two lugs with a pocket at their front end and two recesses each with a projection, respectively, said pockets resiliently fitting around and gripping the projections of the adjacent orthogonal side member. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47F 7/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47F 3/14 (2006.01); A47F 7/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47F 3/14 (2013.01); A47F 7/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0850583 A2 19980701; EP 0850583 A3 20010124; ES 1035899 U 19970601; ES 1035899 Y 19971201

INPADOC legal status


2002-05-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010725

2001-11-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-10-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-07-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-07-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI