Global Patent Index - EP 0850689 B1

EP 0850689 B1 2001-05-30 - Cutter knife

Title (en)

Cutter knife

Title (de)

Kuttermesser

Title (fr)

Couteau de hachoir

Publication

EP 0850689 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97122763 A

Priority

DE 19654733 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2225976A1] The invention relates to a cutter knife adapted to be mounted on a rotatably drivable knife shaft of a meat cutter machine. The blade of the knife is provided with at least one convexly configured margin with a cutting edge therei n and a plurality of openings disposed in predetermined relationship relative to t he cutting edge, the openings being in longitudinal section of substantially concav e configuration and reduce the mass and surface area of the blade from about 15% to about 30% and from about 20% to 50%, respectively, thereby reducing heat accumulation and retention in the blade.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B02C 18/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 3/26 (2006.01); B02C 18/20 (2006.01); B26D 1/00 (2006.01); B26D 1/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26D 1/0006 (2013.01); B02C 18/20 (2013.01); B26D 2001/002 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19654733 C1 19980520; AT 201615 T 20010615; CA 2225976 A1 19980630; CA 2225976 C 20051206; EP 0850689 A1 19980701; EP 0850689 B1 20010530; ES 2159806 T3 20011016; JP H10202578 A 19980804; US 5996917 A 19991207

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20161224

2018-05-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010530

2018-05-07 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20180507

2017-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161223

2017-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161231

2017-10-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161223

2017-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161231

2017-10-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161223

2017-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170102

2017-09-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170101

2017-09-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170831

2017-08-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20161223

2017-08-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 201615 T

- Effective date: 20161223

2017-08-02 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20170101

2017-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151222

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20151218

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151218

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20151217

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20151222

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-12-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-07-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: HOLBEINSTRASSE 36-38, 4051 BASEL (CH)

2008-06-25 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: WILKE, JUERGEN, PROF. DR.

- Free text: WILKE, JUERGEN, PROF. DR.#TRAUTMANNSTRASSE 1#06366 KOETHEN (DE) $ HAACK, EBERHARD, DR.#MARTHA-BRAUTZSCH-STRASSE 8#06108 HALLE/S. (DE) $ EHRLE, EGON, DIPL.-ING.#WARSCHAUER STRASSE 34#15566 SCHOENEICHE (DE) -TRANSFER TO- WILKE, JUERGEN, PROF. DR.#TRAUTMANNSTRASSE 1#06366 KOETHEN (DE) $ HAACK, EBERHARD, DR.#MARTHA-BRAUTZSCH-STRASSE 8#06108 HALLE/S. (DE) $ EHRLE, EGON, DIPL.-ING.#WARSCHAUER STRASSE 34#15566 SCHOENEICHE (DE)

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-02 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: EHRLE, EGON, DIPL.-ING. EN WILKE, JUERGEN, PROF. D

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-11-14 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: EHRLE, EGON, DIPL.-ING.

2001-11-14 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: WILKE, JUERGEN, PROF. DR.

2001-11-14 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: HAACK, EBERHARD, DR.

2001-11-14 [RIN2] INVENTOR CHANGED AFTER GRANT

- Free text: EHRLE, EGON, DIPL.-ING. * WILKE, JUERGEN, PROF. DR. * HAACK, EBERHARD, DR.

2001-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2159806 T3

2001-09-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010810

2001-08-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2001-08-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010830

2001-08-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010830

2001-08-22 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.

2001-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-05-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201615 T 20010615

2000-04-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000223

1999-04-22 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

1999-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1999-03-17 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT CH DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1998-10-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980806

1998-07-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1998-07-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI