Global Patent Index - EP 0850711 B1

EP 0850711 B1 2001-05-23 - Process and machine for forging rod-shaped article having deformed portion at an end thereof

Title (en)

Process and machine for forging rod-shaped article having deformed portion at an end thereof

Title (de)

Verfahren und Maschine zum Schmieden eines Gegenstandes mit einem deformierten Endteil

Title (fr)

Procédé et machine pour forger un article en forme de barre ayant une extrémité déformée

Publication

EP 0850711 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97122837 A

Priority

JP 35604696 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0850711A1] In a forging process according to the present invention, a full enclosed die forging step, a finish forging step, and a deburring step are performed successively. In the full enclosed die forging step, a preformed rod-shaped log (51A) is pressed from the direction perpendicular to the axial direction of the log (51A) with a first upper die half (31) and a first lower die half (21). The log (51A) is pressed by punches (44) from the axial direction thereof for the rough forging. As a result, a formed log (51A) is obtained that has a concave portion at least at one end thereof. In the finish forging step, the formed log (51A) is pressed from the direction perpendicular to the axial direction of the formed log (51A) with an upper die half and a lower die half for the deburring. In this way, the formed log having a burr is obtained. In a deburring step, the formed log having the bur is deburred. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21K 1/76

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21J 5/02 (2006.01); B21K 1/12 (2006.01); B21K 1/76 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21J 9/18 (2013.01); B21K 1/766 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0850711 A1 19980701; EP 0850711 B1 20010523; DE 69704928 D1 20010628; DE 69704928 T2 20010913; JP 3507264 B2 20040315; JP H10180394 A 19980707

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051223

2005-08-10 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041223

2005-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050701

2004-12-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041223

2004-01-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040102

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-12-17 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20031217

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69704928 20010628

2001-06-26 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2000-05-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000408

1999-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB IT

1999-03-17 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

1999-03-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981222

1998-07-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

1998-07-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI