Global Patent Index - EP 0850734 A3

EP 0850734 A3 2000-10-25 - Veneer press

Title (en)

Veneer press

Title (de)

Furnierbügelanlage

Title (fr)

Presse de placage

Publication

EP 0850734 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97103176 A

Priority

DE 19651327 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0850734A2] The veneer ironing-on plant has at least one pressing unit. It also has a return point (5) enabling the material (6,6a) for processing to be sent to a processing point (2) and processed material to be taken from it. The return point may be able to shift the receiving point for the material, at least horizontally, or it can be arranged to receive the material vertically and to shift it at least vertically. The pressing unit (3) may have at least two press chambers, one for initial pressing and the other for final pressing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B27D 3/04; B27D 3/02; B27N 3/22; B30B 7/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27D 3/00 (2006.01); B27D 3/02 (2006.01); B27D 3/04 (2006.01); B30B 7/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B27D 3/02 (2013.01); B27D 3/04 (2013.01); B30B 7/023 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19651327 A1 19980618; CZ 9700846 A3 19990616; EP 0850734 A2 19980701; EP 0850734 A3 20001025; SK 35297 A3 19990507

INPADOC legal status


2003-03-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020903

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

2001-07-18 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 19970312;LV PAYMENT 19970312;SI PAYMENT 19970312

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 19970312;LV PAYMENT 19970312;SI PAYMENT 19970312

2000-10-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 27D 3/04 A, 7B 27N 3/22 B, 7B 30B 7/02 B, 7B 27D 3/02 B

1998-07-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970312

1998-07-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

1998-07-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 970312;LV PAYMENT 970312;SI PAYMENT 970312