EP 0850786 A3 19990428 - Hotmelt transfer material, process for making the material, and the use thereof
Title (en)
Hotmelt transfer material, process for making the material, and the use thereof
Title (de)
Hotmelt-Transfermaterial, Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung und dessen Verwendung
Title (fr)
Matière de hotmelt-transfert, procédé pour sa fabrication et son utilisation
Publication
Application
Priority
CH 320296 A 19961230
Abstract (en)
[origin: EP0850786A2] A hot melt transfer material (I) consists of a porous hot melt layer (II) applied to a support (III). (II) consists of fine thermoplastic polymer particles and a thermoplastic polymer based binder containing anchored microporous particles with a spontaneously wettable surface. Also claimed is the preparation of (I) by coating a dispersion containing particles, dissolved binder, precipitating agent and a solvent having a vapour pressure higher than that of the precipitating agent, onto the support (III) and drying with associated phase inversion and pore formation.
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
B44C 1/17 (2006.01); D06P 5/24 (2006.01); D06P 5/26 (2006.01); D06Q 1/12 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
B44C 1/1712 (2013.01); D06P 5/003 (2013.01); D06Q 1/12 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [A] EP 0618079 A1 19941005 - MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]
- [A] US 5271990 A 19931221 - KRONZER FRANCES J [US], et al
- [AD] US 5242739 A 19930907 - KRONZER FRANCES J [US], et al
- [AD] US 5501902 A 19960326 - KRONZER FRANCIS J [US]
- [A] EP 0588716 A2 19940323 - MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 095, no. 001 28 February 1995 (1995-02-28)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 095, no. 003 28 April 1995 (1995-04-28)
- [A] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 9602, Derwent World Patents Index; Class A97, AN 96-016414, XP002095604
- [A] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 9621, Derwent World Patents Index; Class A89, AN 96-204599, XP002095605
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 011, no. 128 (M - 583) 22 April 1987 (1987-04-22)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 012, no. 134 (M - 689) 23 April 1988 (1988-04-23)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 0850786 A2 19980701; EP 0850786 A3 19990428; EP 0850786 B1 20020313; CH 690711 A5 20001229; DE 59706605 D1 20020418
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 97810964 A 19971210; CH 320296 A 19961230; DE 59706605 T 19971210