Global Patent Index - EP 0850983 A3

EP 0850983 A3 2001-01-24 - Flame-resistant resin material, flame-resistant resin magnet material, and electron beam controller comprising the flame-resistant resin magnet material

Title (en)

Flame-resistant resin material, flame-resistant resin magnet material, and electron beam controller comprising the flame-resistant resin magnet material

Title (de)

Flammwidriger Kuststoff, flammwidriger magnetischer Kunststoff und Elektronenstrahl-Regler, der diesen flammwidrigen Magneten enthält

Title (fr)

Composition de résine ignifuge, matériau résineux ignifuge pour aimant et dispositif de commande de faiceau éléctronique contenant le matériel résineux magnétique ignifuge

Publication

EP 0850983 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 97122895 A

Priority

  • JP 35052496 A
  • JP 28504297 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0850983A2] Provided are non-halogen, flame-resistant, resin materials and resin magnet materials, and also electron beam controllers comprising the resin magnet materials. The resin material comprises (A) a non-halogen resin composition, (B) a metal oxide hydrate, and (C) one or both of antimony trioxide and zinc borate. The resin magnet material comprises those components (A), (B) and (C), and (D) a magnetic material. In the electron beam controller, the four-pole and 6-pole convergence magnets and the two-pole purity controller magnets are made of the resin magnet materials.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08K 3/00; C08K 3/22; C08K 3/38; H01F 1/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08K 3/22 (2006.01); C08K 3/38 (2006.01); C08L 77/00 (2006.01); C08L 101/00 (2006.01); H01J 29/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08K 3/22 (2013.01); C08K 3/2279 (2013.01); C08K 3/38 (2013.01); C08K 2003/2217 (2013.01); C08K 2003/2227 (2013.01); H01J 2229/5682 (2013.01); Y10T 428/31609 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] EP 0230564 A1 19870805 - BANDO CHEMICAL IND [JP]
  • [X] US 4397978 A 19830809 - MCKINNEY LINDA D, et al
  • [A] DE 3301980 A1 19830818 - KANEGAFUCHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]
  • [A] US 5028347 A 19910702 - AN TAE W [KR], et al
  • [X] WO 9310045 A1 19930527 - UNITED STATES BORAX CHEM [US]
  • [X] US 5059651 A 19911022 - UENO KEIJI [JP]
  • [X] GB 2174998 A 19861119 - DAINICHI NIPPON CABLES LTD
  • [X] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 199016, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class A18, AN 1990-119718, XP002147928
  • [X] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 8422, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class A17, AN 1984-137441, XP002060034
  • [X] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 198525, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class A17, AN 1985-149202, XP002147929
  • [X] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 197719, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class A60, AN 1977-33519Y, XP002147930
  • [X] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 198505, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class A17, AN 1985-027416, XP002147931
  • [X] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 198938, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class A17, AN 1989-275144, XP002147932
  • [A] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 9415, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class A85, AN 94-121938, XP002060047
  • [A] DATABASE WPI Section Ch Week 9401, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class A81, AN 94-003222, XP002060048

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0850983 A2 19980701; EP 0850983 A3 20010124; JP H10237324 A 19980908; MY 141569 A 20100514; US 6043728 A 20000328

INPADOC legal status


2002-05-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010725

2001-11-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-10-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-07-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-07-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI