Global Patent Index - EP 0851045 B1

EP 0851045 B1 2000-05-17 - Rotary dobby and loom with such a dobby

Title (en)

Rotary dobby and loom with such a dobby

Title (de)

Rotationsschaftmaschine und Webmaschine mit einer solchen Schaftmaschine

Title (fr)

Ratière rotative et métier à tisser équipé d'une telle ratière

Publication

EP 0851045 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97420240 A

Priority

FR 9616391 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0851045A1] This new rotary rat-trap loom mechanism comprises an oscillatory section (4) at the level of its blades, coupled to a warp frame (6) and associated with an actuating element (2) mounted freely on the main shaft (1). A moving coupling (8) is carried by the cam plate (3) fixed to the actuator. The moving coupling is spring-loaded (10) to carry out angular liaison between the cam plate and a disc (7) fixed on the main shaft. There are two pivoting levers (11) subjected on one side to the action of the warping mechanism (16) and on the other, to that of the spring (13) tending to close the tips (17) of the levers onto one of the engagements (18, 19) of the plate. The original feature is that, when the levers engage, one of them clears one actuator (16) belonging to the warping mechanism. Also claimed is a loom equipped with the mechanism described.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03C 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03C 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03C 1/00 (2013.01); Y10T 74/2101 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0851045 A1 19980701; EP 0851045 B1 20000517; CN 1057352 C 20001011; CN 1186879 A 19980708; DE 69702039 D1 20000621; DE 69702039 T2 20000914; ES 2146969 T3 20000816; FR 2757882 A1 19980703; FR 2757882 B1 19990219; JP 3545185 B2 20040721; JP H10237735 A 19980908; KR 100418080 B1 20040510; US 5908050 A 19990601

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20161227

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161229

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20161227

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151223

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20141223

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091224

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110322

2011-04-04 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110404

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091223

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100831

2010-08-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091223

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081216

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081204

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-02-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20081222

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2146969 T3

2000-08-09 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

2000-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69702039 20000621

2000-06-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000518

2000-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

1999-04-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990224

1999-04-14 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

1999-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI LI

1999-03-17 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI LI

1998-11-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980919

1998-07-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

1998-07-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI