Global Patent Index - EP 0851087 B1

EP 0851087 B1 2000-12-27 - Lower border of doors or windows

Title (en)

Lower border of doors or windows

Title (de)

Unterer Abschluss von Türen oder Fenstern

Title (fr)

Bordure basse de portes ou fenêtres

Publication

EP 0851087 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97122218 A

Priority

DE 19654111 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0851087A2] The door threshold (1) or window sill comprises capping for the lower edge of doors or windows. The section (2) internal to the room is made of plastics or wood. The external section is made of metal (3). The internal part forms the upper side of the threshold (4). The entire transition region between room interior and outside is made of plastics or wood. The outer part is aluminium. The internal section is a blend of polyphenylether (PPE) and styrene/butadiene copolymer (S/B).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 1/70

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 1/32 (2006.01); E06B 1/70 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 1/70 (2013.01); E06B 1/32 (2013.01); E06B 2001/707 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19654111 A1 19980625; CZ 9704083 A3 19980715; EP 0851087 A2 19980701; EP 0851087 A3 19991229; EP 0851087 B1 20001227; PL 323989 A1 19980706

INPADOC legal status


2006-10-11 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20060809

2006-09-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060701

2006-08-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051217

2006-07-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060701

2006-01-20 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2005-12-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051217

2005-12-12 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051212

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-10-03 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: GRETSCH-UNITAS GMBH BAUBESCHLAEGE

- Effective date: 20050808

2005-09-21 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2005-07-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: PROFINE GMBH

2005-05-18 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: PROFINE GMBH

- Effective date: 20010927

2005-05-02 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: GRETSCH-UNITAS GMBH BAUBESCHLAEGE

2005-03-09 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: GRETSCH-UNITAS GMBH BAUBESCHLAEGE

2005-03-09 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WILLICH, PETER

2004-12-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20041229

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-12-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20041227

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-12-27 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20041227

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-06-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: BKV BAU-UND KUNSTSTOFFTECHNISCHE ENTWICKLUNGS-UND

2004-06-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: HT TROPLAST AG

2004-06-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: PROFINE GMBH

2004-05-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: BKV BAU-UND KUNSTSTOFFTECHNISCHE ENTWICKLUNGS-UND

2004-05-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: PROFINE GMBH

2004-04-14 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: BKV BAU-UND KUNSTSTOFFTECHNISCHE ENTWICKLUNGS-UND

- Effective date: 20010216

2004-04-14 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: PROFINE GMBH

- Effective date: 20010927

2004-03-31 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: BKV BAU-UND KUNSTSTOFFTECHNISCHE ENTWICKLUNGS-UND

- Effective date: 20010216

2004-03-31 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: HT TROPLAST AG

- Effective date: 20010927

2004-03-10 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: BKV BAU-UND KUNSTSTOFFTECHNISCHE ENTWICKLUNGS-UND

- Effective date: 20010216

2004-03-10 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: PROFINE GMBH

- Effective date: 20010927

2002-03-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: BKV BAU-UND KUNSTSTOFFTECHNISCHE ENTWICKLUNGS-UND

2002-03-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: HT TROPLAST AG

2002-02-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: BKV BAU-UND KUNSTSTOFFTECHNISCHE ENTWICKLUNGS-UND

2002-02-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: HT TROPLAST AG

2002-01-02 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: BKV BAU-UND KUNSTSTOFFTECHNISCHE ENTWICKLUNGS-UND

- Effective date: 20010216

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-28 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: BKV BAU-UND KUNSTSTOFFTECHNISCHE ENTWICKLUNGS-UND

- Effective date: 20010216

2001-11-21 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: BKV BAU-UND KUNSTSTOFFTECHNISCHE ENTWICKLUNGS-UND

- Effective date: 20010216

2001-11-21 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: HT TROPLAST AG

- Effective date: 20010927

2001-07-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: BKV BAU-UND KUNSTSTOFFTECHNISCHE ENTWICKLUNGS-UND

2001-04-25 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: BKV BAU-UND KUNSTSTOFFTECHNISCHE ENTWICKLUNGS-UND

- Effective date: 20010216

2001-04-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-02-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702813 20010201

2001-01-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010103

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2000-10-12 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2000-10-11 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2000-09-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-07-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000529

2000-01-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991126

1999-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-12-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-06-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WILLRICH, PETER

1999-06-23 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WILLRICH, PETER

1998-07-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

1998-07-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI