Global Patent Index - EP 0851095 B1

EP 0851095 B1 2002-09-25 - Internal cooling blade of a turbo-machine

Title (en)

Internal cooling blade of a turbo-machine

Title (de)

Innengekühlte Turbomaschinenschaufel

Title (fr)

Aube de turbomachine avec refroidissement interieur

Publication

EP 0851095 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97810917 A

Priority

DE 19654115 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0851095A1] A gas turbine blade (W) cooling device has an external flow of hot medium, and an internal coolant flow and involves thermal bridging. This is formed by pegs (S) of material melting at a high temperature, and having higher thermal conductivity than the wall. These project internally into the coolant flow. Preferably the pegs are made of synthetic diamond, made using the C-14 isotope. They are cast into the wall. The space cooled is the closed narrow gap (E) at the rear edge of an internally-cooled gas turbine. The gap and line of pegs, extend over the length of the blade.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01D 5/18; F28F 1/10; F28F 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/18 (2006.01); F01D 9/02 (2006.01); F28F 1/12 (2006.01); F28F 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/187 (2013.01); F28F 1/124 (2013.01); F28F 3/022 (2013.01); F05D 2260/221 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19654115 A1 19980625; CN 1186151 A 19980701; EP 0851095 A1 19980701; EP 0851095 B1 20020925; JP H10196304 A 19980728

INPADOC legal status


2004-06-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040602

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-07-18 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-03-26 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-12-11 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD

2002-11-11 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20021111

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-11-04 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20021104

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59708321 20021031

2002-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20021030

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-09-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-25 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-09-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-09-25 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020925

2001-12-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM

2001-10-31 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: INTERNAL COOLING BLADE OF A TURBO-MACHINE

2001-09-05 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: INTERNAL COOLING BLADE OF A TURBO-MACHINE

2000-06-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB ALSTOM POWER (SCHWEIZ) AG

2000-02-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991215

1999-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

1999-03-17 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-03-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981223

1998-07-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-07-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI