Global Patent Index - EP 0851097 A3

EP 0851097 A3 2000-04-19 - Turbine blade damper and seal

Title (en)

Turbine blade damper and seal

Title (de)

Dämpfungs- und Dichtungselement für Turbinenschaufeln

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'amortissement et d'étanchéité pour aubes de turbine

Publication

EP 0851097 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 97310512 A

Priority

US 77301796 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0851097A2] An integral damper and seal 46 for a turbine blade in a gas turbine engine includes a damper portion 54 which contacts the platform and at least one sealing portion 56, angled radially inward from the damper portion, which makes contact with and seals against the platform. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01D 5/22; F01D 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/26 (2006.01); F01D 5/30 (2006.01); F01D 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 11/008 (2013.01); F01D 5/22 (2013.01); Y02T 50/671 (2013.01); Y10S 416/50 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0851097 A2 19980701; EP 0851097 A3 20000419; EP 0851097 B1 20050302; DE 69732613 D1 20050407; DE 69732613 T2 20050721; JP 4049865 B2 20080220; JP H10196305 A 19980728; US 5785499 A 19980728

INPADOC legal status


2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141223

2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150701

2015-08-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141223

2015-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69732613

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131218

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131218

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100831

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081205

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-03-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-02-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051205

2005-04-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69732613 P 20050407

2005-03-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-03-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-12-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021028

2000-12-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000621

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-07-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-07-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI