Global Patent Index - EP 0851170 B1

EP 0851170 B1 2000-05-17 - Illuminated curtain rod

Title (en)

Illuminated curtain rod

Title (de)

Gardinenstange mit Beleuchtung

Title (fr)

Triangle à rideau avec illumination

Publication

EP 0851170 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97122751 A

Priority

DE 29622476 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0851170A1] The curtain rod is in the form of a rod or tube in holders. In at least one end (3) of the rod (1), or elsewhere within the rod, there is a holder (6) for a bulb (10) or other light. A lead (9) runs from the bulb holder to the outside of the rod. The holder may be externally threaded to fit into an internal thread (4) in the rod end (3). The bulb holder may have a connection device (8), from which a lead (9) passes through a slit (5) in the wall of the tubular rod. It may be possible to screw a lampshade (11) onto the external thread (7) of the bulb holder.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 33/00; A47H 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47H 1/02 (2006.01); F21V 33/00 (2006.01); F21V 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 33/0016 (2013.01); A47H 1/02 (2013.01); A47H 2023/006 (2013.01); F21V 19/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29622476 U1 19980326; EP 0851170 A1 19980701; EP 0851170 B1 20000517

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040701

2003-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030228

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-03-15 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20020315

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SCHRODER HUBERTUS

- Effective date: 20001231

2001-05-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001231

2000-11-15 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000517

2000-11-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-10-13 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701705 20000621

2000-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2000-05-17 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000517

2000-05-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000517

2000-05-17 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000517

2000-05-17 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000517

2000-02-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990408

1999-05-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990408

1999-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

1999-03-17 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

1998-11-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980905

1998-07-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

1998-07-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI