Global Patent Index - EP 0851171 A3

EP 0851171 A3 2000-11-22 - Method for stimulating the circulation in evaporator heating surfaces and evaporator heating surfaces

Title (en)

Method for stimulating the circulation in evaporator heating surfaces and evaporator heating surfaces

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Anregung des Flüssigkeitsumlaufes in Verdampferheizflächen und Verdampferheizfläche

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la stimulation de la circulation liquide dans des surfaces de chauffe d'évaporateur et surfaces de chauffe d'évaporateur

Publication

EP 0851171 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97122628 A

Priority

AT 224596 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0851171A2] The heating surface (6) parallel on the liquid side to the condenser surfaces (5) is inserted on the gas side between the inlet (3) and outlet (4) collector. The pipe coils enclose at least two sides of the condenser heating surfaces. The pipe coils of the pre-heating surface (6) possess less flow resistance than the condenser heating surfaces, because of the fewer curves and flue gas intersections. The joint outlet collector shared with the condenser heating surface is connected to the cylindrical boiler shell (1) by means of connecting pipes (7).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F22D 7/00; F22B 29/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F22B 29/04 (2006.01); F22D 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F22D 7/00 (2013.01); F22B 29/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[X] NL 9402107 A 19960701 - STORK KETELS BV [NL]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0851171 A2 19980701; EP 0851171 A3 20001122

INPADOC legal status


2002-03-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010523

2001-09-13 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-08-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 22D 7/00 A, 7F 22B 29/04 B

2000-01-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AE ENERGIETECHNIK GMBH

1998-07-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-07-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI