Global Patent Index - EP 0851320 B1

EP 0851320 B1 2000-08-02 - Timepiece driven by mechanical means and with reserve power indicating system

Title (en)

Timepiece driven by mechanical means and with reserve power indicating system

Title (de)

Mechanische Uhr mit Gangreserveanzeige

Title (fr)

Pièce d'horlogerie dont le mécanisme est entraîné par des moyens mécaniques et comprenant un dispositif de réserve de marche

Publication

EP 0851320 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96120575 A

Priority

EP 96120575 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0851320A1] In a spring driven clock the spring (8) drives the normal gear train (24) through two rotating elements (2,4) which are coupled by a helical spring (6). The torque exerted by the spring which varies with the amount of reserve remaining causes the angular displacement between the rotating elements (2,4) to vary. The size of the angular displacement between the rotating elements (2,4) is limited by a pin (54) which may only move within a cavity cut in the skirt of the upper element (4). Within this range the angular displacement is directly proportional to the torque and the reserve remaining and the latter is displayed by a needle and scale (42,40) attached to the two rotating elements.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04B 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04B 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04B 9/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0851320 A1 19980701; EP 0851320 B1 20000802; DE 69609621 D1 20000907; DE 69609621 T2 20010412

INPADOC legal status


2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141231

2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150701

2015-09-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150831

2015-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69609621

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131219

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131121

- Year of fee payment: 18

2006-08-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051220

2005-12-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051220

2005-12-20 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051220

2004-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20041130

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001024

2000-10-24 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BOTTI & FERRARI S.R.L.

2000-09-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69609621 20000907

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-10-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990820

1999-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

1999-03-17 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-03-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990104

1998-07-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT