Global Patent Index - EP 0851322 B1

EP 0851322 B1 2000-05-17 - Micro-generator, module and time piece, containing such a micro-generator

Title (en)

Micro-generator, module and time piece, containing such a micro-generator

Title (de)

Mikrogenerator, Modul und Uhrwerk, enthaltend einen solchen Mikrogenerator

Title (fr)

Micro-générateur, module et pièce d'horlogerie, contenant un tel micro-générateur

Publication

EP 0851322 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96810901 A

Priority

EP 96810901 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0851322A1] The microgenerator has a group of electrically connected coils (20,21) and a rotor (10) with an upper and a lower plate (13,14). The rotor plates are mounted on either side of the coils. The upper surface of the lower plate and the lower surface of the upper plate both have magnetised regions of alternating polarity. During rotation the regions of alternating polarity pass by the coils in succession. The coils are arranged asymmetrically about the axis of the rotor.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G04C 10/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G04B 1/10 (2006.01); G04B 17/00 (2006.01); G04C 10/00 (2006.01); G04G 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G04C 10/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0851322 A1 19980701; EP 0851322 B1 20000517; DE 59605259 D1 20000621; ES 2145416 T3 20000701; HK 1008577 A1 20001005; JP 3172702 B2 20010604; JP H1144782 A 19990216; SG 55432 A1 19981221; TW 367646 B 19990821; US 6124649 A 20000926

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-12-23 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59605259

2016-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151211

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091224

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110302

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091223

2011-03-15 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110303

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091223

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100831

2010-08-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091223

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081216

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081212

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081223

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-02-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20081217

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-04-09 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2004-04-07 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20031015

2003-08-13 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2003-07-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: MOINAS & SAVOYE SA

2003-07-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: RICHEMONT INTERNATIONAL S.A.

- Free text: CONSEILS ET MANUFACTURES VLG SA#ROUTE DES GOUTTES D'OR 40#2000 NEUCH?TEL (CH) -TRANSFER TO- RICHEMONT INTERNATIONAL S.A.#10, ROUTE DES BICHES#1752 VILLARS-SUR-GL?NE (CH)

2003-05-28 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: RICHEMONT INTERNATIONAL S.A.

2002-11-15 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2002-10-16 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

2002-08-14 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-08-14 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: CONSEILS ET MANUFACTURES VLG SA

2002-07-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: RONDA AG TRANSFER- CONSEILS ET MANUFACTURES VLG SA

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-11 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: ETA SA FABRIQUES D'EBAUCHES

- Effective date: 20010216

2000-08-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-17 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: EUROPATENT S.A.S.

2000-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2145416 T3

2000-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605259 20000621

2000-06-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTS & TECHNOLOGY SURVEYS, FORNEROD & SAAM

2000-06-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000518

2000-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

1999-06-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990507

1999-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

1999-03-17 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

1999-02-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981208

1998-07-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

1998-07-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI