Global Patent Index - EP 0851381 B1

EP 0851381 B1 2002-11-20 - Optical sensor for fingerprints

Title (en)

Optical sensor for fingerprints

Title (de)

Optischer Sensor für Fingerabdrücke

Title (fr)

Capteur optique d'empreinte digitale

Publication

EP 0851381 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97403161 A

Priority

FR 9616128 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0851381A1] The sensor has an image gathering part (4), a source of illumination (3) and an optical block (2) with a limited angle of view. The optical block has four faces and an irregular trapezoidal shape. The top surface (6) of the optical block is where the finger is rested and the bottom surface (7), parallel to the top, faces the light source. These are joined by a front viewing face (8) from which the image of the finger print is directed toward the image gathering system and a rear face (11). The rear face is inclined less steeply than the viewing face and is angled to reduce parasitic reflections.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06K 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06K 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06K 9/00013 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE DK FI GB NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0851381 A1 19980701; EP 0851381 B1 20021120; AT 228258 T 20021215; DE 69717242 D1 20030102; DE 69717242 T2 20030828; FR 2757974 A1 19980703; FR 2757974 B1 19990212

INPADOC legal status


2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131226

2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140701

2014-10-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69717242

- Effective date: 20140701

2014-08-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131226

2014-07-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69717242

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121122

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121122

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-05-03 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MORPHO, FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SAGEM SECURITE, PARIS, FR

- Document: DE 69717242

- Effective date: 20120308

2012-05-03 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69717242

- Representative's name: ZENZ PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20120308

2010-10-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091231

2010-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091226

2010-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. *SAGEM

- Effective date: 20091231

2009-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20081125

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-02-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20081124

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-05-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-04-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030318

2003-02-20 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030220

2003-02-20 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030220

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69717242 20030102

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK FI GB NL SE

2002-11-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-20 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-11-20 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-11-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 228258 T 20021215

2001-08-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010713

1999-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE DE DK FI GB NL SE

1999-03-17 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK FI GB NL SE

1999-03-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981231

1998-07-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK FI GB NL SE

1998-07-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI