Global Patent Index - EP 0851532 B1

EP 0851532 B1 2002-09-11 - Double antenna, in particular for vehicle

Title (en)

Double antenna, in particular for vehicle

Title (de)

Doppelantenne, insbesondere für ein Fahrzeug

Title (fr)

Antenne double, en particulier pour véhicule

Publication

EP 0851532 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97403142 A

Priority

  • FR 9616113 A
  • FR 9713099 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0851532A1] The aerial comprises a unipolar structure (20) for low frequencies on top of which is a dipole structure (1) for high frequencies. The cable (2) for supplying the dipole aerial has an outer conductor (20) which is used to form the unipolar aerial in the section above the earth plate (M). The section of unipolar aerial which lies beneath earth plane is wound into coils (22) in order to form the secondary of a transformer which then supplies the unipolar aerial. The coils lie within a screened earth space inside the bodywork of the vehicle, the surface of the vehicle forming the earth plane. A frequency switching device is provided in order to select between the different modes of the aerial. The aerial is operational between 30 and 400 MHz.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 5/02; H01Q 9/16; H01Q 9/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 5/15 (2015.01); H01Q 9/16 (2006.01); H01Q 9/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 9/30 (2013.01); H01Q 5/40 (2013.01); H01Q 9/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0851532 A1 19980701; EP 0851532 B1 20020911; AU 4926797 A 19980702; CA 2225368 A1 19980627; DE 69715362 D1 20021017; DE 69715362 T2 20030430; FR 2758012 A1 19980703; FR 2758012 B1 19990528; IL 122619 A 20001206; IL 122619 D0 19980816; NO 976107 A 19980629; NO 976107 D0 19971229; PL 323980 A1 19980706; US 5977920 A 19991102

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20171222

2018-01-10 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20171222

2017-12-23 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69715362

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161209

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161128

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161220

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2005-12-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051223

2004-08-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *THALES

- Effective date: 20021231

2003-03-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030328

2003-03-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-01-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021230

2003-01-08 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030108

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69715362 20021017

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-11 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-09-11 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011207

2001-10-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: THALES

1999-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL

1999-03-17 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL

1999-02-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981214

1998-07-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL

1998-07-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI