Global Patent Index - EP 0851759 A4

EP 0851759 A4 2000-12-06 - COMPOUNDS AND METHODS

Title (en)

COMPOUNDS AND METHODS

Title (de)

VERBINDUNGEN UND VERFAHREN DAZU

Title (fr)

COMPOSES ET PROCEDES ASSOCIES

Publication

EP 0851759 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96930743 A

Priority

  • US 9614347 W
  • US 355695 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9709046A1] This invention relates to quinine and quinidine compounds which are ligands, in particular, antagonists, of the Calcitonin Gene-Related Peptide ("CGRP") receptor. In addition, this invention relates to the treatment and prevention of disease states mediated by CGRP, including, but not limited to, headaches, especially migraines; non-insulin dependent diabetes mellitus; cardiovascular disorders; chronic inflammation; endotoxic shock; arthritis; allergic rhinits; and asthma, all in mammals, by the use of quinine and quinidine CGRP receptor antagonists.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/49; C07D 453/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07D 453/04 (2006.01); A61K 31/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/49 (2006.01); A61P 3/00 (2006.01); A61P 3/10 (2006.01); A61P 5/00 (2006.01); A61P 5/22 (2006.01); A61P 9/00 (2006.01); A61P 11/00 (2006.01); A61P 11/06 (2006.01); A61P 25/06 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/00 (2006.01); C07D 453/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07D 453/02 (2013.01); A61K 31/49 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] DAINES R A ET AL: "Quinine analogs as non-peptide calcitonin gene-related peptide (CGRP) receptor antagonists", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS,GB,OXFORD, vol. 7, no. 20, 21 October 1997 (1997-10-21), pages 2673 - 2676, XP004136510, ISSN: 0960-894X
  • See also references of WO 9709046A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9709046 A1 19970313; EP 0851759 A1 19980708; EP 0851759 A4 20001206; JP H11512396 A 19991026

INPADOC legal status


2001-07-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010109

2000-12-06 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20001024

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

1998-07-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980320

1998-07-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL