Global patent index - EP 0851765 A4

EP 0851765 A4 2000-01-19 - THERAPEUTIC AND PROPHYLACTIC METHODS USING HEAT SHOCK PROTEINS

Title (en)

THERAPEUTIC AND PROPHYLACTIC METHODS USING HEAT SHOCK PROTEINS

Title (de)

THERAPEUTISCHE UND PROPHYLAKTISCHE VERFAHREN, WELCHE HITZESCHOCK-PROTEINE EINSETZEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDES THERAPEUTIQUE ET PROFILACTIQUE UTILISANT DES PROTEINES DU CHOQUE THERMIQUE

Publication

EP 0851765 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96930818 A

Priority

  • US 9614556 W
  • US 52754795 A
  • US 71191896 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9710000A1] The present invention relates to immunogenic complexes of heat shock proteins (hsp) noncovalently bound to exogenous antigenic molecules which when administered to an individual elicit specific immunological responses in the host. Methods of prevention and treatment of cancer and infectious disease are provided.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 39/385; A61K 35/12; A61K 39/00; A61K 39/02; A61K 39/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 31/00 (2006.01); A61K 38/21 (2006.01); A61K 38/22 (2006.01); A61K 39/00 (2006.01); A61K 39/002 (2006.01); A61K 39/005 (2006.01); A61K 39/008 (2006.01); A61K 39/012 (2006.01); A61K 39/02 (2006.01); A61K 39/04 (2006.01); A61K 39/095 (2006.01); A61K 39/118 (2006.01); A61K 39/12 (2006.01); A61K 39/125 (2006.01); A61K 39/13 (2006.01); A61K 39/145 (2006.01); A61K 39/15 (2006.01); A61K 39/165 (2006.01); A61K 39/20 (2006.01); A61K 39/21 (2006.01); A61K 39/235 (2006.01); A61K 39/245 (2006.01); A61K 39/25 (2006.01); A61K 39/29 (2006.01); A61K 39/295 (2006.01); A61P 31/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/04 (2006.01); A61P 31/10 (2006.01); A61P 31/12 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/02 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 39/0011 (2013.01); C07K 14/47 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); A61K 2039/6043 (2013.01); A61K 2039/622 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9710000 A1 19970320; AU 6973496 A 19970401; AU 727673 B2 20001221; CA 2231998 A1 19970320; EP 0851765 A1 19980708; EP 0851765 A4 20000119; JP H11513369 A 19991116

INPADOC legal status

2008-06-25 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20080219

2006-11-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010326

2001-05-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010326

2000-01-26 [RA4] DATE AND KIND OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 19991208

2000-01-19 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19991208

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-07-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980409

1998-07-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE