Global patent index - EP 0851830 B1

EP 0851830 B1 2000-01-05 - METHOD OF PRODUCING FINNED PACKAGES AND A SEPARATING DEVICE FOR CARRYING OUT THE METHOD

Title (en)

METHOD OF PRODUCING FINNED PACKAGES AND A SEPARATING DEVICE FOR CARRYING OUT THE METHOD

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON FLOSSENPACKUNGEN UND TRENNEINRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'EMBALLAGES A FERMETURE GAUFFREE ET DISPOSITIF DE SEPARATION UTILISE POUR LA MISE EN OEUVRE DUDIT PROCEDE

Publication

EP 0851830 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96929164 A

Priority

  • CH 9600324 W
  • CH 269095 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9710996A1] The method proposed calls for a crush blade (9), which separates cross-sealed plastic bags from each other, to be built into a cross-sealing jaw. The crush blade (9) has a zig-zag crush edge (16) made up of V-shaped grooves (17, 18) laterally staggered with respect to each other. Joining with the angles (26, 27) of the crush edge (16) are sharp cutting edges (24, 25) which run in the direction of rotation (19) of the blade (9). The cutting edges (24, 25) make an angle with the plane (23) of the crush edge (16). This ensures a long life of the blade (9) and makes it easy for the consumer to tear open the bags.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 51/30; B26D 1/00; B26D 1/40; B26D 3/10; B26F 1/20; B65B 61/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 1/00 (2006.01); B26D 1/40 (2006.01); B26D 3/10 (2006.01); B26F 1/20 (2006.01); B65B 51/30 (2006.01); B65B 61/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26F 1/20 (2013.01); B26D 1/0006 (2013.01); B26D 1/405 (2013.01); B26D 3/10 (2013.01); B65B 51/306 (2013.01); B65B 61/08 (2013.01); B26D 2001/0053 (2013.01); B26D 2001/006 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9710996 A1 19970327; AU 6868596 A 19970409; DE 59604129 D1 20000210; EP 0851830 A1 19980708; EP 0851830 B1 20000105; ES 2142085 T3 20000401; US 6023917 A 20000215

INPADOC legal status

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140401

2014-08-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130919

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130919

2014-06-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59604129

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140401

2014-05-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130919

2013-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120920

2013-10-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20131018

2013-08-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130401

2013-04-17 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20130401

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121122

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120925

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120920

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-12-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20110928

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-11-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110923

- Year of fee payment: 16

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2000-12-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2142085

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-02-18 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO TORTA S.R.L.

2000-02-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59604129

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20000210

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-02-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000106

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT NL

1999-05-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990407

1998-09-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIG PACK SYSTEMS AG

1998-07-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980323

1998-07-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT NL