Global Patent Index - EP 0851960 A4

EP 0851960 A4 2002-11-06 - TELESCOPING DERRICK

Title (en)

TELESCOPING DERRICK

Title (de)

TELESKOPTURM

Title (fr)

DERRICK TELESCOPIQUE

Publication

EP 0851960 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 95933577 A

Priority

IB 9500901 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9711243A1] A telescoping four-sided drilling derrick (20) and method or erection that is to be positioned on a drill floor (F) over a well bore and is capable of withstanding severely adverse weather, environmental or geologic conditions. The derrick (20) is in several sections and includes a bottom section (22), a top section (30) and at least one intermediate section (26, 28) all for superpositioning over the bottom section (22) to form a vertical four-sided tower. Each of the sections is composed of vertical members positioned in each of the four corners (38a-38d) of each section to thereby form a total of four faces (40a-40d) around the perimeter of each section. A window (46) is one face sufficiently large to receive consecutively therebelow at least one section. In turn each of the intermediate sections (26, 28) is inserted within the bottom section (22) for subsequent serial telescopic raising of the intermediate sections (26, 28).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04H 12/18; B66C 23/60; E04H 12/34; E21B 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66C 23/60 (2006.01); E04H 12/18 (2006.01); E04H 12/34 (2006.01); E21B 15/00 (2006.01); H04M 1/21 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 15/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FR GB IE IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9711243 A1 19970327; CA 2232303 A1 19970327; CA 2232303 C 20051129; DE 69534605 D1 20051215; DE 69534605 T2 20060727; EP 0851960 A1 19980708; EP 0851960 A4 20021106; EP 0851960 B1 20051109

INPADOC legal status


2011-08-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100918

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-06-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100918

2011-04-13 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110401

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090918

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100401

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090821

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-11-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090831

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090824

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081018

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080918

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-06-27 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2006-10-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060810

2006-09-18 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060918

2006-05-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-02-09 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060209

2006-02-09 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060209

2005-12-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69534605 P 20051215

2005-12-14 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2005-11-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB IE IT NL SE

2005-11-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-08-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030709

2002-11-06 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB IE IT NL SE

2002-11-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 04H 12/18 A, 7B 66C 23/60 B, 7E 21B 15/00 B, 7E 04H 12/34 B

1998-07-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980417

1998-07-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB IE IT NL SE