Global Patent Index - EP 0851971 B1

EP 0851971 B1 2001-12-12 - PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR PREHEATING THE FEED WATER TO A STEAM GENERATOR IN POWER STATION PROCESSES

Title (en)

PROCESS AND DEVICE FOR PREHEATING THE FEED WATER TO A STEAM GENERATOR IN POWER STATION PROCESSES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUM VORWÄRMEN DES SPEISEWASSERS EINES DAMPFERZEUGERS IN KRAFTWERKSPROZESSEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE PRECHAUFFAGE DE L'EAU D'ALIMENTATION D'UN GENERATEUR DE VAPEUR DANS LES PROCESSUS DE CENTRALES ELECTRIQUES

Publication

EP 0851971 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96931765 A

Priority

  • DE 19535318 A
  • EP 9603869 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19535318A1] A steam mixture from a thermo-compressor (11) is applied to the last preheating stage (HDV2) to raise the temperature of the feed water of a steam generator (1). KZÜ steam (Cold intermediate reheating steam) is fed from an outlet tapping (A1) of the high-pressure turbine (2) to an intake union (13) on the thermo-compressor (11). The operating steam here is steam from the generator (1) with which the KZÜ steam is compressed and mixed. Exergetically lower steam is extracted by a second thermocompressor from a tapping (A3) of a medium-pressure turbine (3) using operating steam from the steam generator (1). The steam mixture obtained is used to raise the temperature of the first preheating stage (HDV1) of the preheating system (6).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01K 7/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01K 7/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01K 7/40 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE DK ES FI GB IE IT NL PT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19535318 A1 19970327; DE 19535318 C2 19971127; AT 210783 T 20011215; EP 0851971 A1 19980708; EP 0851971 B1 20011212; TR 199800323 T1 19980521; WO 9711259 A1 19970327

INPADOC legal status


2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110904

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 210783 T

- Effective date: 20110904

2012-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110904

2012-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120403

2012-07-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59608461

- Effective date: 20120403

2012-05-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110904

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100729

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100921

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20100914

- Year of fee payment: 15

2003-06-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *STEAG ENCOTEC G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-08-21 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2002-06-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020627

2002-06-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-03-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020226

2002-03-12 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020312

2002-03-12 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020312

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59608461 20020124

2002-01-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FI GB IE IT NL PT

2001-12-12 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210783 T 20011215

2001-04-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010228

2000-08-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: STEAG ENCOTEC GMBH

1998-07-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980114

1998-07-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FI GB IE IT NL PT