Global Patent Index - EP 0851978 B1

EP 0851978 B1 2000-04-26 - CONTROL DEVICE FOR A DIESEL-OPERATED INTERNAL-COMBUSTION ENGINE AND OIL-HEATING SYSTEM

Title (en)

CONTROL DEVICE FOR A DIESEL-OPERATED INTERNAL-COMBUSTION ENGINE AND OIL-HEATING SYSTEM

Title (de)

STEUEREINRICHTUNG FÜR EINE DIESELBETRIEBENE BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE UND EINE ÖLHEIZUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE POUR MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE DIESEL ET POUR SYSTEME DE RECHAUFFAGE DE L'HUILE

Publication

EP 0851978 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96932558 A

Priority

  • DE 29514973 U
  • EP 9604084 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2232556A1] The invention concerns a control device for a diesel-operated internal combustion engine, said device comprising a mixer unit (5) in which diesel and air can be mixed to form a fuel mixture, a diesel feed line (2) which feeds diesel to the mixer unit (5), an air feed line (3) which feeds air to the mixer unit (5), a fuel mixture line (4) which feeds the fuel mixture out of the mixer unit (5) and into the internal combustion engine, and an adjusting device (6) which adjusts the flow of diesel through the diesel feed line (2). In order to provide for a diesel-operated internal combustion engine a control device which reduces the fuel consumption and pollutant emissions by optimizing the combustion process, the control device according to the invention further comprises a heater (7) which dehumidifies the air flowing through the air feed line (3) and heats this air to a uniform temperature, a control unit (8) which is disposed in the air feed line (3) downstream of the heater (7) and controls the flow of air through the air feed line (3) as a function of the engine speed, and a limiter unit (12) which is disposed in the air feed line (3) downstream of the control unit (8) and predetermines the maximum amount of air which can flow through the air feed line (3) into the mixer unit (5).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 31/04; F02B 1/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 31/16 (2006.01); F02M 33/00 (2006.01); F23K 5/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 33/00 (2013.01); F02M 31/16 (2013.01); F23K 5/20 (2013.01); Y02T 10/126 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29514973 U1 19970206; AT 192216 T 20000515; AU 7566496 A 19970409; CA 2232556 A1 19970327; DK 0851978 T3 20000925; EP 0851978 A1 19980708; EP 0851978 B1 20000426; ES 2147934 T3 20001001; GR 3033970 T3 20001130; PT 851978 E 20001031; TR 9800500 T2 19980921; US 6186125 B1 20010213; WO 9711268 A1 19970327

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050918

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20021011

2003-06-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020401

2002-07-31 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20020331

2002-07-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-06-03 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2002-06-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020401

2002-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020531

2002-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-05-08 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20010918

2002-05-07 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2002-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020501

2002-04-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020401

2002-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: GEHLING ADELHEID HEDWIG GEB. OTTENBREIT

- Effective date: 20010930

2002-03-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020331

2002-03-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020331

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010930

2001-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010930

2001-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010930

2001-09-19 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010919

2001-09-19 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010919

2001-09-18 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010918

2001-09-18 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010918

2001-09-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010918

2001-04-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-31 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Free text: 20000426 *GEHLING ADELHEID HEDWIG GEB. OTTENBREIT

2000-11-17 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20001117

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-10-31 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Free text: ADELHEID HEDWIG GEHLING, GEB. OTTENBREIT DE

- Effective date: 20000803

2000-10-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000725

2000-10-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001003

2000-10-02 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: ADELHEID HEDWIG GEHLING GEB. OTTENBREIT

2000-10-02 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: GEHLING, ADELHEID HEDWIG, GEB. OTTENBREIT

2000-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2147934 T3

2000-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20000930

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-09-25 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-09-11 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20000911

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-09-06 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20000906

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-09-05 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20000905

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-08-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20000831

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20000829

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-08-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20000828

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-08-24 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20000824

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-08-23 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20000823

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-08-18 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20000818

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-08-15 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20000815

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-08-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-09 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: GEHLING, ADELHEID HEDWIG, GEB. OTTENBREIT

2000-08-09 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Free text: GEHLING, JOHANNES

2000-07-17 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

2000-07-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2000-07-14 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: GEHLING, JOHANNES TRANSFER- ADELHEID HEDWIG GEHLIN

2000-05-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605063 20000531

2000-04-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 192216 T 20000515

1999-09-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990714

1998-07-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980408

1998-07-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE