Global Patent Index - EP 0851980 B1

EP 0851980 B1 2000-01-19 - ROTARY VANE PUMP

Title (en)

ROTARY VANE PUMP

Title (de)

FLÜGELZELLEN PUMPE

Title (fr)

POMPE ROTATIVE A PALETTES

Publication

EP 0851980 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96931052 A

Priority

  • EP 9603942 W
  • IT TO950737 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9711277A1] A rotary pump including a stator (1) with a bore (11) defined by a cylindrical side wall (113), a cylindrical rotor (2) tangent to the inside of the bore (11) and rotatable about an axis (X) that is off-centre relative to said bore, and two vanes (3, 4) slidably fitted in radial housings (e.g. 25) in the rotor (2) and each provided with two opposite edges (e.g. 31, 32) of which the first (31) engages the side wall (113) of the bore. The rotor (2) is hollow, a cylinder (7) coaxial with the cylindrical wall (113) of the bore fits into the rotor, and each vane selectively engages the cylinder to form in the rotor a compression chamber and an expansion chamber between which passes an oil flow fed through a channel (5) in the bottom wall of the bore and a groove (6) in the rotor.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04C 18/344; F04C 29/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04C 25/02 (2006.01); F01C 21/08 (2006.01); F04C 18/344 (2006.01); F04C 29/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01C 21/0872 (2013.01); F01C 21/0836 (2013.01); F04C 29/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9711277 A1 19970327; DE 69606315 D1 20000224; DE 69606315 T2 20000518; EP 0851980 A1 19980708; EP 0851980 B1 20000119; ES 2141532 T3 20000316; IT 1281346 B1 19980218; IT TO950737 A1 19970318; IT TO950737 D0 19950918; JP H11512506 A 19991026

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160910

2016-12-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20161227

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160908

2016-09-28 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20160908

2016-09-09 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69606315

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150925

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151125

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150923

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150922

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150923

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-09-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-01-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2141532 T3

2000-03-16 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: PATRITO BREVETTI

2000-02-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69606315 20000224

2000-02-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000119

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-03-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990210

1998-07-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970702

1998-07-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT