Global Patent Index - EP 0851990 B1

EP 0851990 B1 2001-12-05 - BURNER, IN PARTICULAR FOR A GAS TURBINE

Title (en)

BURNER, IN PARTICULAR FOR A GAS TURBINE

Title (de)

BRENNER, INSBESONDERE FÜR EINE GASTURBINE

Title (fr)

BRULEUR, EN PARTICULIER POUR TURBINE A GAZ

Publication

EP 0851990 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96942244 A

Priority

  • DE 9601756 W
  • DE 19535287 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9711311A2] The invention relates to a burner with an axis (1) and an arrangement rotationally symmetrical thereto which comprises an outer casing (2) and an inner casing (3) coaxial thereto. This arrangement defines an annular gap (4) which extends from an inlet (5) to an outlet (6) and is intended to guide a current (7) of oxygen-containing gas. A plurality of nozzles (9) for supplying a fuel to the current (7) and an angular momentum grid (8) are arranged in the annular gap (4). The arrangement comprising the outer casing (2) and the inner casing (3) is designed in such a manner that the current (7) flows through the annular gap (4) between the angular momentum grid (8) and the outlet (6) at a substantially constant meridional speed. The burner is particularly suitable for use in a gas turbine (15, 16, 17).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23D 14/24; F23C 7/00; F23D 14/26; F23D 14/82

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/82 (2006.01); F23C 7/00 (2006.01); F23D 14/24 (2006.01); F23D 14/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/24 (2013.01); F23C 7/004 (2013.01); F23D 14/26 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9711311 A2 19970327; WO 9711311 A3 19970515; EP 0851990 A2 19980708; EP 0851990 B1 20011205; ES 2169273 T3 20020701; JP 2000512723 A 20000926; JP 3939756 B2 20070704; RU 2156405 C2 20000920; US 6038864 A 20000321

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160916

2016-10-12 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20160916

2016-09-17 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59608389

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151120

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150924

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150910

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150909

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-09-10 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2004-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030918

2003-09-18 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030918

2003-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-11-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-09-18 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020918

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2169273 T3

2002-05-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-03-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020221

2002-03-05 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020305

2002-01-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59608389 20020117

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2000-04-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000306

1998-07-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980304

1998-07-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE