Global Patent Index - EP 0852079 B1

EP 0852079 B1 2000-05-24 - COAXIAL CABLE CONNECTION DEVICE

Title (en)

COAXIAL CABLE CONNECTION DEVICE

Title (de)

ANSCHLUSSEINRICHTUNG FÜR KOAXIALKABEL

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE RACCORDEMENT POUR CABLES COAXIAUX

Publication

EP 0852079 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96938931 A

Priority

  • DE 9601699 W
  • DE 19535130 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9711511A1] Special connection techniques are proposed for connecting the inner and outer conductors for coaxial right-angle pin-and-socket connectors and straight coaxial pin-and-socket connectors. In the case of a right-angle connector, the inner conductor of the coaxial cable is connected by the insulation displacement technique whilst the outer conductor is crimped. In the case of a straight coaxial pin-and-socket connector, the inner conductor is connected by crimping or soldering and the outer conductor is connected by the insulation displacement technique.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 9/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 9/05 (2006.01); H01R 9/053 (2006.01); H01R 4/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 9/053 (2013.01); H01R 9/0518 (2013.01); H01R 4/023 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

EP 0419038 A1 19910327 - OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO [JP]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9711511 A1 19970327; EP 0852079 A1 19980708; EP 0852079 B1 20000524; NO 980761 A 19980520; NO 980761 D0 19980223

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090910

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100401

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-06-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100531

2010-05-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090910

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081031

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080929

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080917

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2000-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000930

2000-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000930

2000-08-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-24 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000824

2000-08-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000725

2000-06-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605317 20000629

2000-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2000-05-24 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000524

2000-04-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TYCO ELECTRONICS LOGISTICS AG

1999-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990322

1998-07-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980304

1998-07-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI SE