Global Patent Index - EP 0852122 A3

EP 0852122 A3 2000-12-20 - Bed base

Title (en)

Bed base

Title (de)

Unterbett zur Auflage von Matratzen

Title (fr)

Sommier de lit

Publication

EP 0852122 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 97122984 A

Priority

DE 19700130 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0852122A2] The base has flat support elements each with a bearing plate for the mattress and a spring for the bearing plate. Each leaf-spring (9) is supported on two abutments (5) and extends down through between the abutments so that at least some areas of the springs are located between these abutments. The leaf springs have fixing elements (12) by means of which they are fixed on two adjoining abutments. The springs can be formed as strips of elastic plastics material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 1/00; A47C 23/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 23/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 23/002 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0852122 A2 19980708; EP 0852122 A3 20001220; DE 19700130 A1 19980709

INPADOC legal status


2002-02-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010702

2001-10-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 47C 1/00 A, 7A 47C 23/00 B

1998-07-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-07-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI