Global Patent Index - EP 0852124 A3

EP 0852124 A3 2000-07-19 - Means for fixing slats to a mattress base

Title (en)

Means for fixing slats to a mattress base

Title (de)

Lagerung für Federholzleisten am Grundrahmen eines Lattenrostes

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour la fixation de lattes à un sommier

Publication

EP 0852124 A3 (FR)

Application

EP 97403186 A

Priority

  • FR 9700005 A
  • FR 9706098 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0852124A2] The fixing bracket consists of a U-shaped spring (3) with fastenings (8, 9) on its two ends, one for connecting to the end of a slat (4) and the other for joining to a lengthwise member (1) of the bed frame. The two ends of the springs are connected to the fastenings (8, 9) by sliders (12) which clip onto the spring ends, and the lower fastening (9) has a coating (14) of a synthetic material on its side facing towards the upper one (8).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 23/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 23/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 23/063 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0852124 A2 19980708; EP 0852124 A3 20000719; FR 2757754 A1 19980703; FR 2757754 B1 19990305; FR 2763490 A1 19981127; FR 2763490 B1 19990806

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030305

2001-03-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE ES FR GB NL

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-02-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981210

1998-07-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB NL

1998-07-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI