Global Patent Index - EP 0852125 A3

EP 0852125 A3 2001-01-24 - Device and method for filling a shop rack

Title (en)

Device and method for filling a shop rack

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Füllung von Ladenregalen

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé pour le remplissage de rayons de magasin

Publication

EP 0852125 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 97203778 A

Priority

NL 1004686 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0852125A2] A device and a method for offering goods for sale. The invention relates to a shop rack for offering articles for sale, which shop rack is provided with means for placing articles into a shop rack or affixing them thereto in a conveniently arranged manner. Keeping the shop racks filled and tidy is a labour-intensive activity, which hinders the shopping consumers in an undesirable manner. In order to avoid this inconvenience, the articles are placed in or attached to a sub-frame, which can be quickly affixed to the shop rack, or possibly to a means of transport. This makes it possible to exchange the sub-frame and the articles attached thereto as a whole, and to have the filling of said sub-frame take place outside the sales area. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47F 5/08; A47F 5/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47F 5/08 (2006.01); A47F 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47F 5/108 (2013.01); A47F 5/0807 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0852125 A2 19980708; EP 0852125 A3 20010124; NL 1004686 C1 19980605

INPADOC legal status


2002-03-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010703

2001-11-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-10-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-07-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-07-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI