Global Patent Index - EP 0852252 A4

EP 0852252 A4 2000-06-28 - ELECTRODEPOSITION COATING COMPOSITION HAVING ELECTRODEPOSITION POTENTIALITY AND PROCESS FOR ELECTRODEPOSITION COATING

Title (en)

ELECTRODEPOSITION COATING COMPOSITION HAVING ELECTRODEPOSITION POTENTIALITY AND PROCESS FOR ELECTRODEPOSITION COATING

Title (de)

ELEKTROTAUCHLACKIER-ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT GUTEM ELEKTROTAUCHPOTENTIAL UND VERFAHREN ZUR ELEKTROTAUCHLACKIERUNG

Title (fr)

COMPOSITION POUR REVETEMENT PAR ELECTRODEPOSITION POSSEDANT UN BON POTENTIEL D'ELECTRODEPOSITION, ET PROCEDE DE REVETEMENT PAR ELECTRODEPOSITION

Publication

EP 0852252 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97932985 A

Priority

  • JP 9702539 W
  • JP 21301996 A
  • JP 35811196 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0852252A1] An electrodeposition coating composition that is excellent in bath stability and that can give a cured film enhanced in hardness and an electrodeposition coating process is provided. An electrodeposition coating composition to be used in an electrodeposition coating process which comprises : the electrodeposition step of immersing a substrate in an electrodeposition coating composition and applying a voltage between the substrate as an anode or cathode and a counter electrode to thereby form a film of said electrodeposition coating composition on the surface of the substrate, and the heating step of heating said film obtained in the above electrodeposition step, and said electrodeposition coating composition comprising having electrodeposition potentiality against the curing reaction of said film. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C09D 5/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C09D 5/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C09D 5/44 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0852252 A1 19980708; EP 0852252 A4 20000628; EP 0852252 B1 20060426; AU 3633797 A 19980210; AU 720262 B2 20000525; CA 2232664 A1 19980129; CA 2232664 C 20080429; CN 1198180 A 19981104; CN 1203136 C 20050525; CN 1296442 C 20070124; CN 1644635 A 20050727; DE 69735747 D1 20060601; DE 69735747 T2 20070329; US 2002027077 A1 20020307; US 6641711 B2 20031104; WO 9803595 A1 19980129

INPADOC legal status


2012-06-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110723

2012-05-24 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69735747

- Effective date: 20120201

2012-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120201

2012-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110801

2012-04-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120330

2012-03-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110723

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100721

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100721

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100805

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-04-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070129

2006-12-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-06-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69735747 P 20060601

2006-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2006-04-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-09-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010815

2000-06-28 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000515

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-09-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980722

1998-07-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB