Global Patent Index - EP 0852275 A3

EP 0852275 A3 2000-03-01 - Insulated ceiling composed of a plurality of layers

Title (en)

Insulated ceiling composed of a plurality of layers

Title (de)

Aus mehreren Schichten bestehende Decke

Title (fr)

Plafond composé de plusieurs couches

Publication

EP 0852275 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98103743 A

Priority

  • DE 4415181 A
  • EP 95106504 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0682161A1] A roof substructure for roofs decked with roof decking boards is made up, in the case of a couple roof to be insulated, of an exposed panel work (4) attached to the rafters (6); a film-type vapour barrier (8) laid on the exposed panel work (4); an insulating layer (10) based on mineral wool which is laid on the vapour barrier (8); and a film (24) which is water repellent and is open to diffusion which is laid on the insulating layer (10) and covers the latter. In this case, the insulating layer (10) is made up of at least two types of strips (18, 22) which are laid alternately individually and without gaps parallel to an edge of the roof, that is to say in a steep-pitched couple roof to the ridge (16) and to the eaves (12), the one type of strip (18) serving to absorb the roof load, introduced via base battens (20), of the roof parts located above the insulating layer (10), and having a far higher compression strength in relation to the other type of strip (22), serving purely insulating purposes, and being of a many times narrower design compared to the other type of strip (22), serving insulating purposes. In this case, the strips (18) for absorbing the load have a compression strength of at least 50 kN/m<2> and consist, like the strips (22) serving purely insulating purposes, solely of bonded mineral wool. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 13/16; E04D 11/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 12/00 (2006.01); E04D 13/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 13/16 (2013.01); E04D 12/00 (2013.01); E04D 13/1612 (2013.01); E04D 13/1618 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0682161 A1 19951115; EP 0682161 B1 19980701; EP 0682161 B2 20020417; AT 167911 T 19980715; CZ 9501114 A3 19951213; DE 4415181 A1 19951102; DE 4447681 C2 20000531; EP 0852275 A2 19980708; EP 0852275 A3 20000301

INPADOC legal status


2002-09-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020302

2001-12-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011019

2000-05-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAINT-GOBAIN ISOVER

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR LI NL

2000-03-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 04D 13/16 A, 7E 04D 11/02 B

1998-07-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980303

1998-07-08 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 682161

1998-07-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR LI NL