Global patent index - EP 0852296 A3

EP 0852296 A3 2000-01-26 - Inflator with drop-in batteries and universal adapters

Title (en)

Inflator with drop-in batteries and universal adapters

Title (de)

Batteriebetriebene Aufblasvorrichtung mit Universaladaptor

Title (fr)

Gonfleur entraînée par batterie avec adapteur universel

Publication

EP 0852296 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98300052 A

Priority

  • US 77884197 A
  • US 96087997 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0852296A2] A portable, battery powered inflator with removable batteries (16,16') which are switch (18) activated. The inflator has an air intake (4) and output (6) for delivering air into a variety of air bladders with different sized valves. The batteries (16,16') are typical dry cells and not rechargeable to save cost. The inflator has a cover (15) that allows quick removable and replacement of the batteries. An adapter assembly including a transition structure and adapters (38,38') are provided to allow inflation of a variety of bladders having different sized valves. The attaching of the transition structure engages the switch (18) completing an electrical circuit that activates the motor (8) to deliver air automatically. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 25/08; F04D 25/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 25/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 25/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0852296 A2 19980708; EP 0852296 A3 20000126

INPADOC legal status

2002-03-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010727

2000-11-09 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2000-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-11-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: 6F 04D 25/08 A, 6F 04D 25/06 B

1998-07-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-07-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI