Global Patent Index - EP 0852316 B1

EP 0852316 B1 2003-06-25 - Gas burner

Title (en)

Gas burner

Title (de)

Gasbrenner

Title (fr)

Brûleur à gaz

Publication

EP 0852316 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97119993 A

Priority

DE 19648808 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: JPH10160128A] PROBLEM TO BE SOLVED: To ensure a large output spectrum and reduce waste gas emission by forming a molded structure having a plurality of through-hole as an open hollow structure, and surrounding a combustion chamber with the hollow structure. SOLUTION: During operation of a gas burner combustion gas is introduced into a combustion gas supply pipe passage 23. The combustion gas is uniformly distributed into a front chamber 21 with a distribution plate 24, and flows into a combustion chamber 18 through a through-hole (average opening area: 0.6 to 2.6mm<2> ) 11 provided in a molded structure 10 from the front chamber 21. Thereupon, the combustion gas is ignited and the whole of the combustion chamber 18 is filled with a flame whereby a flame is formed into a spiral form and is recirculated. Based upon such formation of a spiral of the flame waste gas produced upon a combustion process is subjected to residuals burning in a multi-stage manner, and hence the combustion is achieved substantially without ant residues. Hereby, waste gas emission is considerably reduced, and particularly the contents of carbon monoxide and nitrogen oxide are shareply reduced.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23D 14/58; F23D 14/02; F23D 14/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/14 (2006.01); F23D 14/02 (2006.01); F23D 14/20 (2006.01); F23D 14/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/20 (2013.01); F23D 14/02 (2013.01); F23D 14/58 (2013.01); F23D 2203/1015 (2013.01); F23D 2203/1023 (2013.01); F23D 2203/106 (2013.01); F23D 2212/103 (2013.01); F23D 2212/201 (2013.01); F23D 2900/00003 (2013.01); F23D 2900/14001 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19648808 A1 19980604; AT 243829 T 20030715; EP 0852316 A2 19980708; EP 0852316 A3 19990721; EP 0852316 B1 20030625; JP 3936045 B2 20070627; JP H10160128 A 19980619; PL 323340 A1 19980608; US 6129545 A 20001010

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091114

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091114

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100601

2010-10-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100601

2010-07-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091114

2010-06-23 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100601

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081117

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081125

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081121

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-01-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20081113

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-08-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: CERAMAT, S.COOP.

- Effective date: 20070605

2007-07-04 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2006-09-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: SCHOTT AG

- Effective date: 20060612

2006-05-17 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2004-07-09 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-06-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040326

2003-12-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031222

2003-11-14 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031114

2003-10-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59710342 P 20030731

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT NL

2003-06-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-25 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030625

2000-11-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000921

2000-03-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-03-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000121

1999-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-07-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1998-07-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT NL

1998-07-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI