Global patent index - EP 0852367 A3

EP 0852367 A3 2000-01-12 - Security system

Title (en)

Security system

Title (de)

Sicherheitssystem

Title (fr)

Système de sécurité

Publication

EP 0852367 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 97122169 A

Priority

GB 9700094 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0852367A2] A security system for locating items of electrical equipment, which is comprised of security identification units and a controller unit, the security identification units being located within the items of electrical equipment. To provide power to the items of electrical equipment they must be connected to a power distribution network, which may be a national electrical grid or 'mains' supply. In use the security identification units are arranged to communicate identification data with the controller unit via the electrical power distribution network, thereby providing an indication of a presence or an absence of at least one of the items of electrical equipment. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 13/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08B 13/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 13/1418 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0852367 A2 19980708; EP 0852367 A3 20000112; GB 9700094 D0 19970219

INPADOC legal status

2000-03-22 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 19991221

2000-01-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: 7G 08B 13/14 A, 7H 04L 12/28 B, 7G 05B 19/042 B, 7G 08B 25/06 B

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-02-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981209

1998-07-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1998-07-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI