Global Patent Index - EP 0852453 B1

EP 0852453 B1 2000-08-16 - Electronic ballast for a discharge lamp, provided with a lamp power measurement by means of a DC-signal

Title (en)

Electronic ballast for a discharge lamp, provided with a lamp power measurement by means of a DC-signal

Title (de)

Elektronisches Vorschaltgerät einer Gasentladungslampe mit Messung der Lampenleistung durch ein Gleichstromsignal

Title (fr)

Ballast électronique pour une lampe à décharge, avec mesure de la puissance de la lampe en utilisant un signal à courant continu

Publication

EP 0852453 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97660149 A

Priority

FI 970018 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0852453A1] The invention relates to a controllable or dimmable electronic ballast for a low pressure discharge lamp, especially a fluorescent lamp. A halfbridge inverter (TR1, TR2; V2, V3) supplies power to a load circuit (L2, C2, C3, LL). A regulation or control block (A1/I, II) regulates the frequency of the halfbridge inverter for regulating the light output of a lamp. One branch of the halfbridge inverter is provided with current measuring elements (R2, R3, C4), from which is obtained current measurement information proportional to the load circuit power for the regulation or control block, which is further supplied separately with measurement information about a direct current that has passed through the lamp and is proportional to the internal resistance of the lamp. The latter measurement information is used for controlling regulation of the lamp at low regula tion levels of the light output. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 41/00; H05B 41/392

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/392 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/3925 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0852453 A1 19980708; EP 0852453 B1 20000816; DE 69702829 D1 20000921; DE 69702829 T2 20001207; FI 101188 B1 19980430; FI 101188 B 19980430; FI 970018 A0 19970103

INPADOC legal status


2002-07-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

2002-04-24 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20011202

2002-04-24 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free text: 20011202

2001-11-20 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20011120

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-11-19 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20011119

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-11-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20011112

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-10-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: OSRAM GMBH FI/PATENTWESEN

2001-09-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: OSRAM GMBH

2001-08-22 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: OSRAM GMBH FI/PATENTWESEN

- Effective date: 20010516

2001-07-18 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: OSRAM GMBH

- Effective date: 20010516

2000-11-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20001122

- Year of fee payment: 4

2000-10-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-10-23 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-09-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69702829 20000921

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

1999-12-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HELVAR OY AB

1999-03-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990204

1999-03-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT NL

1999-03-24 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

1999-03-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990108

1998-07-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

1998-07-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI