Global Patent Index - EP 0852516 B1

EP 0852516 B1 2002-11-20 - FUEL JET ARRANGEMENT AND PROCESS FOR FLOW REGULATION

Title (en)

FUEL JET ARRANGEMENT AND PROCESS FOR FLOW REGULATION

Title (de)

BRENNSTOFFDÜSENANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR DURCHFLUSSREGULIERUNG

Title (fr)

ENSEMBLE AJUTAGE POUR COMBUSTIBLE ET PROCEDE DE REGULATION DU DEBIT

Publication

EP 0852516 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96944567 A

Priority

  • DE 9601860 W
  • DE 19536534 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9711782A2] The invention pertains to a fuel jet arrangement (1) for a liquid fuel burner with a principal axis (5) and a return flow region (4), a fuel jet (3) and an inflow region (2) along the principal axis (5) between the fuel jet (3) and return flow region (4). Within the inflow region (2) a twisting stream of fuel can be generated. The return flow region (4) is provided with an annular slit (6) which adjoins the inflow region (2), tapers down in the downstream direction of the inflow region (2) and merges into a return flow duct (7). The invention also pertains to a use of the fuel jet arrangement (1) in an oil burner for a gas turbine and a process for regulating the supply of fuel in a liquid fuel burner.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 1/00 (2006.01); B05B 1/34 (2006.01); F23D 11/28 (2006.01); F23D 11/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23D 11/28 (2013.01); B05B 1/3426 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9711782 A2 19970403; WO 9711782 A3 19970814; DE 59609892 D1 20030102; EP 0852516 A1 19980715; EP 0852516 B1 20021120; JP 3850881 B2 20061129; JP H11511547 A 19991005; RU 2160413 C2 20001210

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091008

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100927

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100930

2011-06-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100927

2011-05-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100927

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100401

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090929

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090910

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081121

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-05-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-07-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-05-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030529

2003-03-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030226

2003-02-20 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030220

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59609892 20030102

2002-11-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2002-11-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020307

1998-07-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980320

1998-07-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE