Global Patent Index - EP 0852522 B1

EP 0852522 B1 2002-11-06 - QUICK CHANGE TOOLING METHOD AND APPARATUS

Title (en)

QUICK CHANGE TOOLING METHOD AND APPARATUS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM SCHNELLWECHSELN VON WERKZEUGEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR OUTILLAGE A CHANGEMENT RAPIDE

Publication

EP 0852522 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96925270 A

Priority

  • CA 2230271 A
  • US 9611180 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9800250A1] A quick change tooling method and apparatus has been devised for tube bending operations in which the bend die (34), clamp die (35) and pressure die (36) as well as mandrel and wiper die (37), if required, are preassembled along with a tube corresponding to the tube to be bent in that particular die assembly by releasable latches (52, 54) or other types of releasable connectors; and each preassembled die set as described can be removed, transported and relocated on a bending machine (10) as a complete assembly and in exact aligned operating position without readjustment. A lift mechanism (84) is provided to facilitate lifting of each die set.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 7/04; B21D 9/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 7/02 (2006.01); B21D 7/024 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 7/02 (2013.01); B21D 7/024 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9800250 A1 19980108; CA 2230271 A1 19980108; EP 0852522 A1 19980715; EP 0852522 A4 19991215; EP 0852522 B1 20021106

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050701

2006-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060201

2005-07-01 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050701

2004-07-15 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040715

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-07-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040714

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-07-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040708

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030807

2003-06-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69624723 20021212

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2000-03-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000113

1999-12-15 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19991028

1999-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1998-07-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980325

1998-07-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB