Global patent index - EP 0852562 B1

EP 0852562 B1 2000-01-26 - SYSTEM FOR DISPENSING SHEET MATERIAL, IN PARTICULAR BANK NOTES AND THE LIKE

Title (en)

SYSTEM FOR DISPENSING SHEET MATERIAL, IN PARTICULAR BANK NOTES AND THE LIKE

Title (de)

EINRICHTUNG ZUM AUSGEBEN VON BLATTMATERIAL, INSBESONDERE VON WERTSCHEINEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR DISTRIBUER UN MATERIAU SOUS FORME DE FEUILLES, NOTAMMENT DES BILLETS DE BANQUE ET SIMILAIRES

Publication

EP 0852562 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96934365 A

Priority

  • DE 9601548 W
  • DE 19536480 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19536480C1] The invention concerns a system for dispensing sheet material, in particular bank notes and the like, from one of two sheet compartments to a collecting station, each compartment having a delivery roller which is driven by a stepping motor, is associated with a sheet compartment and acts on the first sheet of each stack. Each sheet drawn off is fed to a conveyor roller which is driven by a stepping motor and is also associated with the sheet compartment. The conveyor roller feeds the sheet to a dispensing conveyor common to both sheet compartments. The system is driven by two stepping motors which can be driven in opposite senses when a sheet is dispensed from a compartment, so that in each case one delivery roller is driven in the first sense of rotation and the conveyor roller of the other sheet compartment is driven in the second sense of rotation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 3/44; B65H 5/06; G07D 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07D 1/00 (2006.01); B65H 3/44 (2006.01); B65H 5/06 (2006.01); B65H 5/26 (2006.01); G07D 7/00 (2006.01); G07D 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 5/025 (2013.01); B65H 3/44 (2013.01); G07D 11/0003 (2013.01); B65H 2555/24 (2013.01); B65H 2701/1912 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19536480 C1 19970417; BR 9610731 A 19990713; CN 1201434 A 19981209; EP 0852562 A1 19980715; EP 0852562 B1 20000126; ES 2142616 T3 20000416; JP H11512693 A 19991102; US 6003856 A 19991221; WO 9712824 A1 19970410

INPADOC legal status

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090822

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090821

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090821

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090831

2010-05-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100430

2010-04-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20090821

2009-02-27 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080825

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080822

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080818

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080826

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-01-31 [PGRI DE] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGRI

- Effective date: 20020124

2007-12-21 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20030912

2004-03-31 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2003-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2002-08-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020831

2002-08-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020831

2002-08-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020822

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-08-17 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010817

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-07-26 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010726

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-01-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-11-10 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2000-08-23 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2000-04-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000330

2000-04-26 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000426

2000-04-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2142616

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-04-11 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-03-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59604322

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-02

2000-02-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ALTHOFF PATENTANWALTSBUERO

2000-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI PT SE

1999-07-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990531

1998-07-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980320

1998-07-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI PT SE