Global Patent Index - EP 0852563 A4

EP 0852563 A4 2000-05-24 - SEPARATOR WITH HOLD BACK BELT FOR FEEDER

Title (en)

SEPARATOR WITH HOLD BACK BELT FOR FEEDER

Title (de)

MIKROWELLENFÜLLSTANDSMESSGERÄT

Title (fr)

SEPARATEUR A COURROIE DE RETENUE POUR ALIMENTATEUR

Publication

EP 0852563 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 95933924 A

Priority

US 9512175 W

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 5/00 (2006.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

AU 3640095 A 19970417; DE 69525266 D1 20020314; DE 69525266 T2 20021121; EP 0852563 A1 19980715; EP 0852563 A4 20000524; EP 0852563 B1 20020130

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090925

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100401

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-06-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100531

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081031

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080917

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-11-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080926

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-06-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080401

2008-05-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080401

2006-09-24 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20060924

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-05-18 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040925

2004-09-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040925

2003-09-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030924

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-01-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-07-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-03-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69525266 20020314

2002-01-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2002-01-16 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: SEPARATOR WITH HOLD BACK BELT FOR FEEDER

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2000-10-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000828

2000-05-24 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000406

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

1998-07-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980416

1998-07-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL