Global patent index - EP 0852892 B1

EP 0852892 B1 2000-03-22 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING THE POWER OF A HIGH-PRESSURE GAS-DISCHARGE LAMP

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING THE POWER OF A HIGH-PRESSURE GAS-DISCHARGE LAMP

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUR LEISTUNGSSTEUERUNG EINER HOCHDRUCK-GASENTLADUNGSLAMPE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR REGULER LA PUISSANCE D'UNE LAMPE A DECHARGE EN ATMOSPHERE GAZEUSE HAUTE PRESSION

Publication

EP 0852892 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96919634 A

Priority

  • DE 9601000 W
  • DE 19535663 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19535663A1] Proposed is a method of increasing the power of a high-pressure gas-discharge lamp (1) working with a control unit which controls a power-supply circuit in accordance with a characteristic curve (21) to provide essentially constant power. To change the power, the method calls for controlled displacement of the voltage/current characteristic curve, in particular by the manipulation of one or more of the characteristic-curve input parameters. The device for carrying out the method is designed in such a way that the control circuit includes a microcontroller (2) and that displacement of the characteristic curve is carried out under software control, in particular by the addition or subtraction of suitable step values ( DELTA U) or continuously variable parameters to the control values (U1, U2) fed to the control element (3). In another embodiment, the method uses an ASIC to displace the characteristic curve under hardware control.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 41/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/14 (2006.01); H05B 41/288 (2006.01); H05B 41/38 (2006.01); H05B 41/392 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/3921 (2013.01); H05B 41/2882 (2013.01); H05B 41/386 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19535663 A1 19970327; DE 59604796 D1 20000427; EP 0852892 A1 19980715; EP 0852892 B1 20000322; JP 3949168 B2 20070725; JP H11514486 A 19991207; US 6051939 A 20000418; WO 9712498 A1 19970403

INPADOC legal status

2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-04-25 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59604796

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130101

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110823

- Year of fee payment: 16

2005-06-07 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050607

2005-04-08 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2005-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2003-06-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030618

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20010607

2001-06-07 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010607

2001-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-07-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-06-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000525

2000-06-13 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-05-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20000522

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59604796

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-27

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1998-09-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980818

1998-07-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980427

1998-07-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT