Global Patent Index - EP 0853005 B1

EP 0853005 B1 2000-09-20 - Method of producing forms and form obtained by this method

Title (en)

Method of producing forms and form obtained by this method

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung von Formularen und nach diesem Verfahren hergestelltes Formular

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication de formulaires et formulaire obtenu par ce procédé

Publication

EP 0853005 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 97400046 A

Priority

EP 97400046 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0853005A1] A method of manufacturing labels with a basic information field, and a number of fields of fixed or variable data on peel-off labels involves preparing and printing a web of paper or similar material on one side with the basic information field (1), together with the variable elements for the label sheet (12a,13a) and for the separate labels (12b-12f,13b-13f), with a lateral gap between them for spacing on the web to give the sheets and labels. The other side of the web is covered by a layer of silicone (8) and at least one layer of adhesive (10) in place at the labels to be held at the web. One strip of the web is turned over to place the printed labels at the layers of silicone and adhesive. Also claimed is a label with a base sheet (2) to carry at least one variable description (12a,13a) and a cladding (9) over at least part of the sheet surface. At least one label (11a-11e) is held by a layer of silicone and adhesive, defined by cutting through the cladding, with further variable data labels (2b-2f,13b-13f) identical to the variable descriptions at the base sheet. The sheet and the cladding are from the same paper web.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B42D 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42D 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B42D 5/027 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0853005 A1 19980715; EP 0853005 B1 20000920; AT 196448 T 20001015; AU 5038098 A 19980716; AU 728474 B2 20010111; CA 2226863 A1 19980709; DE 69703146 D1 20001026; DE 69703146 T2 20010329; ES 2150740 T3 20001201

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050109

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20020211

2002-10-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-10-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020801

2002-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020930

2002-09-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-08-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20020109

2002-08-27 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2002-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020801

2002-08-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020801

2002-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: MOORE BUSINESS FORMS INC.

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-01-10 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020110

2002-01-09 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020109

2002-01-09 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020109

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-01-23 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20010123

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-01-10 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010110

2000-12-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20001228

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-12-22 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20001222

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-12-21 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20001221

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-12-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20001220

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-12-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20001220

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-12-20 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20001220

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-12-20 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20001220

- Year of fee payment: 5

2000-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2150740 T3

2000-11-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001018

2000-10-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69703146 20001026

2000-09-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-09-25 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-09-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 196448 T 20001015

1999-12-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991104

1999-03-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1999-03-31 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1998-12-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981029

1998-07-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1998-07-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI