Global Patent Index - EP 0853133 B1

EP 0853133 B1 2001-05-23 - Use of an aluminium alloy for pressure die casting

Title (en)

Use of an aluminium alloy for pressure die casting

Title (de)

Verwendung einer Aluminiumlegierung zum Druckgiessen

Title (fr)

Utilisation d'un alliage d'aluminium pour moulage sous pression

Publication

EP 0853133 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97119976 A

Priority

  • CH 341894 A
  • EP 95937067 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9615281A1] A cast aluminium alloy contains 3.0 to 6.0 % by weight magnesium, 1.4 to 3.5 % by weight silicon, 0.5 to 2.0 % by weight manganese, maximum 0.15 % by weight iron, maximum 0.2 % by weight titanium, the rest being aluminium and other residual impurities that make up each 0.02 % by weight or all together maximum 0.2 % by weight. This cast aluminium alloy is particularly suitable for die casting, thixotropic casting or thixotropic forging. It may in particular be used for die casting components whose mechanical properties are subject to stringent requirements, since these properties are already present in the cast state and a subsequent thermal treatment may thus be dispensed with.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 21/08; B22D 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 1/00 (2006.01); C22C 21/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 1/005 (2013.01); C22C 21/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9615281 A1 19960523; AT 177158 T 19990315; AT 201457 T 20010615; AU 3928495 A 19960606; DE 59505226 D1 19990408; DE 59509294 D1 20010628; EP 0792380 A1 19970903; EP 0792380 B1 19990303; EP 0792380 B2 20020731; EP 0853133 A1 19980715; EP 0853133 B1 20010523; ES 2129866 T3 19990616; ES 2129866 T5 20030101; ES 2158428 T3 20010901

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051018

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-02-13 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

2006-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061130

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-09-06 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20060629

2006-09-06 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free text: 20060629

2005-10-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051026

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-10-24 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20051024

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-10-18 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051018

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-10-13 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20051013

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-10-11 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20051011

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-11-17 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20041117

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-03-24 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: CORUS ALUMINIUM VOERDE GMBH

- Effective date: 20020222

2004-03-24 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: VAW-IMCO

- Effective date: 20020222

2004-03-24 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Effective date: 20020221

2002-04-17 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: CORUS ALUMINIUM VOERDE GMBH

- Effective date: 20020222

2002-04-17 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: VAW-IMCO

- Effective date: 20020222

2002-04-17 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

- Effective date: 20020221

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-09-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010815

2001-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2158428 T3

2001-07-27 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2001-06-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59509294 20010628

2001-05-23 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 792380

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-05-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201457 T 20010615

1999-04-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990309

1999-01-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981120

1998-10-28 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

1998-07-15 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 792380

1998-07-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT SE