Global Patent Index - EP 0853147 B1

EP 0853147 B1 2000-10-11 - Cleaning lip

Title (en)

Cleaning lip

Title (de)

Putzlippe

Title (fr)

Lèvre de nettoyage

Publication

EP 0853147 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97111910 A

Priority

DE 19642198 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19642198A1] The cleaning lip (11), for a rotating roller of a drawing unit which processes textile fibre materials, has a groove (12) near the carrier, parallel to the longitudinal axis of the roller.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 5/62

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 5/62 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 5/62 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19642198 A1 19980416; DE 19642198 C2 19991104; EP 0853147 A1 19980715; EP 0853147 B1 20001011; US 5940925 A 19990824

INPADOC legal status


2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150803

- Year of fee payment: 19

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070712

2006-07-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060731

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2001-09-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-03-09 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2001-01-08 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ING. ZINI MARANESI & C. S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-11-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59702452

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-11-16

2000-10-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

1999-03-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE IT LI

1999-03-31 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

1998-12-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19981102

1998-07-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980519

1998-07-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

1998-07-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;RO;SI